This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2021 at 07:56:10 (UTC).

Stuart C. Irby Company v. Moore

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Stuart C Irby Company filed an Other lawsuit against Moore. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alex G. Tse. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-MC-80036

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alex G. Tse

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stuart C. Irby Company

Defendant

James Moore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tara L Blake

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

150 3Rd Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

3 #1

Exhibit A Writ of Execution

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Writ of Execution Issued as to James Moore (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION for Writ of Execution by Stuart C. Irby Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Writ of Execution)(Blake, Tara) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MISCELLANEOUS MATTER: 890 Enrollment of Foreign Judgment ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 0971-15604608.). Filed by Stuart C. Irby Company. (Blake, Tara) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stuart C. Irby Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tara L Blake