This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/18/2022 at 08:34:35 (UTC).

Stryker Corporation, et al. v. Microport Navibot International, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 Stryker Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Microport Navibot International, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard G. Andrews and Mary Pat Thynge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-MC-00184

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

Referral Judge

Mary Pat Thynge

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Stryker Corporation

Howmedica Osteonics Corp.

Stryker Employment Company, LLC

Defendants

Benny Hagag

Microport Orthopedics, Inc.

Respondent

Microport Navibot International, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Alexandra M. Joyce

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Akhil K. Gola

C. Bryan Wilson

David Randall J. Riskin

Respondent Attorneys

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) REDACTED VERSION of #19 Declaration by Microport Navibot International, LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

26 #1

Exhibits 1-5

26 #26

Main Document

#25

(#25) REDACTED VERSION of #17 Combined Opening and Answering Brief, by Microport Navibot International, LLC. (Farnan, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2022 (nms). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#19

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#17

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

11 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#7) SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Microport Navibot International, LLC to respond to the Motion to Compel to 5/13/2022 filed by Microport Navibot International, LLC.; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no reply brief shall be filed. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/4/2022. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Stryker Corporation for Howmedica Osteonics Corp. filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (apk) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Akhil Gola in Support of D.I. #1 MOTION to Compel by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (apk) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#2

(#2) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/3/2022. (apk) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Text of Proposed Order

1 #1

Exhibit 1-12

1 #1

Main Document

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REDACTED VERSION of #19 Declaration by Microport Navibot International, LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REDACTED VERSION of #18 Declaration, by Microport Navibot International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-5)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REDACTED VERSION of #17 Combined Opening and Answering Brief, by Microport Navibot International, LLC. (Farnan, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2022 (nms). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORAL ORDER re #16 CROSS-Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by Microport Navibot International, LLC, #11 MOTION to Compel Microport Navibot International, LLC to Compel with Plaintiffs' Subpoena filed by Stryker Employment Company, LLC, Stryker Corporation, Howmedica Osteonics Corp.: In view of the pending MOTION TO COMPEL (D.I. #11) and accompanying CROSS MOTION TO QUASH (D.I. #16), IT IS ORDERED THAT there shall be no further briefing on these motions. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/23/2022. (dat) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark Tung and Haihang Wang filed by Microport Navibot International, LLC. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/23/2022. (dat) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docket(#23) ORAL ORDER: The case is now REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/23/2022. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(nms) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark Tung and Haihang Wang - filed by Microport Navibot International, LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (i) Navibot's Brief Opposing Stryker's Motion to Compel, or in the Alternative, in Support of Navibot's Cross-Motion to Quash or Modify Stryker's Subpoena (D.I. #17 ); (ii) Declaration of Mark Tung Opposing Stryker's Motion to Compel, or in the Alternative, in Support of Navibot's Cross-Motion to Quash or Modify Stryker's Subpoena (D.I. #18 ); and (iii) Declaration of Michael Gallagher Opposing Stryker's Motion to Compel, or in the Alternative, in Support of Navibot's Cross-Motion to Quash or Modify Stryker's Subpoena (D.I. #19 ), by Microport Navibot International, LLC. (Farnan, Michael) Modified on 5/24/2022 (nms). (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to Microport Navibot International, LLC re #19 Sealed Declaration, #17 Sealed Combined Opening and Answering Brief, and #18 Sealed Declaration. Upon review of the filings it was determined that they do not comply with Local Rule 5.2(b)(1). Respondent is requested to supplement the docket with a certificate of service for these transactions. (nms) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Shanghai MicroPort MedBot (Group) Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate MicroPort Scientific Corporation for Microport Navibot International, LLC filed by Microport Navibot International, LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney C. Bryan Wilson, David Randall J. Riskin, and Akhil K. Gola - filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Microport Navibot International, LLC to respond to the Motion to Compel to 5/13/2022 filed by Microport Navibot International, LLC.; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no reply brief shall be filed. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/4/2022. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Microport Navibot International, LLC to respond to the Motion to Compel to 5/13/2022 - filed by Microport Navibot International, LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Compel (D.I. #1 ) is now REFFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/20/2022. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(nms) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketRemark: Case Submitted for Routine Judicial Assignment. (apk) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Stryker Corporation for Howmedica Osteonics Corp. filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (apk) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Akhil Gola in Support of D.I. #1 MOTION to Compel by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (apk) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/3/2022. (apk) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Compel Microport Navibot International, LLC to Comply with Plaintiffs' Subpoena (Receipt Number ADEDC-3854648) - filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation, Stryker Employment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) Modified on 5/17/2022 (smg). (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STRYKER EMPLOYMENT COMPANY LLC A MICHIGAN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Microport Orthopedics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where STRYKER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOWMEDICA OSTEONICS CORP. is a litigant