This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2022 at 08:42:27 (UTC).

Stryk Group USA LLC v. Herman

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 Stryk Group USA LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Herman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. GALLAGHER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00993

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. GALLAGHER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Stryk Group USA LLC

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Ronald Jacob Herman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

ZACHARY E. NAHASS

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorney

ANDREW S. ABRAMSON

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #4

Designation Form

#2

(#2) Ronald Jacob Herman's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Stryk Group USA LLC by Ronald Jacob Herman.(ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ZACHARY E. NAHASS on behalf of Stryk Group USA LLC with Certificate of Service(NAHASS, ZACHARY) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Counsel by ZACHARY E. NAHASS on behalf of Stryk Group USA LLC(NAHASS, ZACHARY) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ronald Jacob Herman, filed by Stryk Group USA LLC.(NAHASS, ZACHARY) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#7

(#7) Statement Disclosure Form by Stryk Group USA LLC. (NAHASS, ZACHARY) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM (RESTATED) against Stryk Group USA LLC by Ronald Jacob Herman.(ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE that a Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been set as follows:Lead counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Thursday, June 9, 2022 at 11:00 AM, at the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. Counsel are required to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) and to complete and submit to the Court the Joint Rule 26(f) Report no later than Monday, May 30, 2022. The Parties are advised that the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this Court is the Honorable Pamela A. Carlos. (mas) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #8 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Stryk Group USA LLC.(NAHASS, ZACHARY) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #8 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Stryk Group USA LLC.(NAHASS, ZACHARY) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE that a Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been set as follows:Lead counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Thursday, June 9, 2022 at 11:00 AM, at the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. Counsel are required to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) and to complete and submit to the Court the Joint Rule 26(f) Report no later than Monday, May 30, 2022. The Parties are advised that the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this Court is the Honorable Pamela A. Carlos. (mas) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM (RESTATED) against Stryk Group USA LLC by Ronald Jacob Herman.(ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement Disclosure Form by Stryk Group USA LLC. (NAHASS, ZACHARY) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ronald Jacob Herman, filed by Stryk Group USA LLC.(NAHASS, ZACHARY) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Counsel by ZACHARY E. NAHASS on behalf of Stryk Group USA LLC(NAHASS, ZACHARY) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ZACHARY E. NAHASS on behalf of Stryk Group USA LLC with Certificate of Service(NAHASS, ZACHARY) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • Docket(#3) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Lancaster County. (ke) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Ronald Jacob Herman's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Stryk Group USA LLC by Ronald Jacob Herman.(ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ronald Jacob Herman (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BPAEDC-15790475), filed by Ronald Jacob Herman. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form)(ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/16/2022) (sbt). (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less