This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:51:00 (UTC).

Struttmann v. Korte et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Struttmann against Korte in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Henry Edward Autrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASHLEE STRUTTMANN

Defendants

STEPHEN KORTE

Unknown Employees of the Pike County Missouri Sherriff

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael G. Berry for Defendant Stephen Korte. (Berry, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#12

(#12) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings (MCB) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#9

(#9) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/6/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/13/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/15/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 10/2/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE Attorney Entry of Appearance: by Plaintiff Ashlee Struttmann Myles D. McDonnell Entry for Plaintiff (McDonnell, Bernard) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant STEPHEN KORTE with receipt number AMOEDC-7419125, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by ASHLEE STRUTTMANN. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDonnell, Bernard) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#11

(#11) Defendant Stephen Korte's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Stephen Korte.(McDaniels, Ryan) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading ;Extension to file the following: Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading ;Proposed extension date 10/04/2019 by Defendant Stephen Korte. (McDaniels, Ryan) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

1 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ashlee Struttmann Process Server: Timothy J. Moore (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form)(McDonnell, Bernard) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan James McDaniels for Defendant Stephen Korte. (McDaniels, Ryan) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

2 #1

Original Filing Form

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings (MCB) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Defendant Stephen Korte's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Stephen Korte.(McDaniels, Ryan) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***REMARK: Re #10 Attorney Bernard McDonnell attempted to file an Entry of Appearance on behalf of Myles McDonnell. However, Myles McDonnell is not admitted to the bar of this Court. Myles McDonnell was notified of this by voicemail on 10/3/2019. If he becomes admitted to the Court, he may then file a proper Entry of Appearance. (CMC) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE Attorney Entry of Appearance: by Plaintiff Ashlee Struttmann Myles D. McDonnell Entry for Plaintiff (McDonnell, Bernard) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/6/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/13/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9N before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/15/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 10/2/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Docket Text ORDER as to Stephen Korte Re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant Stephen Korte; ORDERED GRANTED. (Stephen Korte answer due 10/4/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 9/24/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading ;Extension to file the following: Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading ;Proposed extension date 10/04/2019 by Defendant Stephen Korte. (McDaniels, Ryan) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael G. Berry for Defendant Stephen Korte. (Berry, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan James McDaniels for Defendant Stephen Korte. (McDaniels, Ryan) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ashlee Struttmann. Stephen Korte served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (McDonnell, Bernard) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#3) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Bernard P. McDonnell, Jr.. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Ashlee Struttmann Process Server: Timothy J. Moore (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form)(McDonnell, Bernard) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant STEPHEN KORTE with receipt number AMOEDC-7419125, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by ASHLEE STRUTTMANN. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDonnell, Bernard) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less