This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2022 at 07:49:11 (UTC).

Strum v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 Strum filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey J. Helmick(MDL2197). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-DP-20025

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey J. Helmick(MDL2197)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LISA STRUM

Defendants

DePuy Orthopaedics Inc.

DePuy Inc.

DePuy International Limited

Johnson & Johnson

Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James A. Morris, Jr.

Attorney at Morris Law Firm

4001 W. Alameda Avenue

Burbank, CA 91505

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica L. Brennan

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg

55 Madison Avenue

Morristown, NJ 07960

Susan M. Sharko

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath - Florham Park

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (P,R) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Strum. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 7/28/2022, answer due 9/26/2022 filed on behalf of Lisa Strum (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Strum. Johnson & Johnson International waiver sent on 7/28/2022, answer due 9/26/2022 filed on behalf of Lisa Strum (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Strum. Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. waiver sent on 7/28/2022, answer due 9/26/2022 filed on behalf of Lisa Strum (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#6

(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Strum. DePuy Inc. waiver sent on 7/28/2022, answer due 9/26/2022 filed on behalf of Lisa Strum (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#7

(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Strum. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. waiver sent on 7/28/2022, answer due 9/26/2022 filed on behalf of Lisa Strum (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Strum. DePuy International Limited waiver sent on 8/3/2022, answer due 11/1/2022 filed on behalf of Lisa Strum (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#9

(#9) First Amended complaint as to Plaintiff Lisa Strum against All Defendants. Filed by Lisa Strum. (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First Amended complaint as to Plaintiff Lisa Strum against All Defendants. Filed by Lisa Strum. (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Strum. DePuy International Limited waiver sent on 8/3/2022, answer due 11/1/2022 filed on behalf of Lisa Strum (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Strum. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. waiver sent on 7/28/2022, answer due 9/26/2022 filed on behalf of Lisa Strum (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Strum. DePuy Inc. waiver sent on 7/28/2022, answer due 9/26/2022 filed on behalf of Lisa Strum (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Strum. Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. waiver sent on 7/28/2022, answer due 9/26/2022 filed on behalf of Lisa Strum (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Strum. Johnson & Johnson International waiver sent on 7/28/2022, answer due 9/26/2022 filed on behalf of Lisa Strum (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lisa Strum. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 7/28/2022, answer due 9/26/2022 filed on behalf of Lisa Strum (Morris, James) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (P,R) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand as to Plaintiff Lisa Strum against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11533166. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:10-md-02197. Filed by LISA STRUM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Morris, James) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DePuy Orthopaedics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where DePuy International Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN