This case was last updated from PACER on 10/04/2020 at 07:05:47 (UTC).

Structurlam Mass Timber Corporation v. Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Structurlam Mass Timber Corporation filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Rudolph and Sletten, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-05428

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

structurlam Mass Timber Corporation

Defendant

Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Navtej Singh Dhillon

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

101 California Street, Suite 3600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Nischay Kishan Bhan

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

910 Louisiana St.

Houston, TX 77002

Joseph A Colagiovanni, Jr

910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Shamus Sean Flynn

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

101 California Street, Suite 3600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron David Acevedo Gest

330 Cordova St., Apt. 307

Los Angeles, CA 91101

David Christian Romyn

Attorney at Nida Romyn PC

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Responses due by 10/30/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Case stayed until 11/24/2020 hearing date. The 11/9/2020 Case Management Conference date is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

20 #3

Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion Re Extension of Time

20 #2

Declaration of Nischay K. Bhan in Support of Administrative Motion Re Extension

20 #1

Declaration of Navi Singh Dhillon in Support of Administrative Motion Re Extensi

#20

(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Navi Singh Dhillon in Support of Administrative Motion Re Extension of Time, #2 Declaration of Nischay K. Bhan in Support of Administrative Motion Re Extension of Time, #3 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion Re Extension of Time)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

18 #3

Declaration of Kelli Quinn

18 #2

Request for Judicial Notice

18 #1

Declaration of David C. Romyn

#18

(#18) MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David C. Romyn, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Kelli Quinn)(Romyn, David) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

8 #1

Affidavit Certification of Bar Membership for Nischay Kishan Bhan

#8

(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Nischay Kishan Bhan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14787213.) filed by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Bar Membership for Nischay Kishan Bhan)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

7 #1

Affidavit Certification of Bar Membership for Joseph Alfred Colagiovanni, Jr.

#7

(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joseph Alfred Colagiovanni, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14787104.) filed by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Bar Membership for Joseph Alfred Colagiovanni, Jr.)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation.. (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/5/2020) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/5/2020) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Rudolph and Sletten, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14780077.). Filed bystructurlam Mass Timber Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/5/2020) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Responses due by 10/30/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Case stayed until 11/24/2020 hearing date. The 11/9/2020 Case Management Conference date is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Status Conference held on 9/21/2020. Case stayed until motion hearing date. Responses due by 10/30/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Total Time in Court: 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Pam Hebel. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#22) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, Status Conference set for Monday, 9/21/2020 02:30 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers to be held via Zoom. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ) filed byRudolph and Sletten, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Gest ISO R&S's Response to Administrative Motion Re Extension of Time)(Romyn, David) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Navi Singh Dhillon in Support of Administrative Motion Re Extension of Time, #2 Declaration of Nischay K. Bhan in Support of Administrative Motion Re Extension of Time, #3 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion Re Extension of Time)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Certificate of Interested Entities by Rudolph and Sletten, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tutor Perini Corporation for Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.. (Romyn, David) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David C. Romyn, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Kelli Quinn)(Romyn, David) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE HELD VIA ZOOM. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 11/9/2020 02:00 PM via Zoom before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website: www.cand.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by David Christian Romyn (Romyn, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Rudolph and Sletten, Inc.. (Romyn, David) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Rudolph and Sletten, Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Nischay Kishan Bhan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14787213.) filed by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Bar Membership for Nischay Kishan Bhan)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joseph Alfred Colagiovanni, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14787104.) filed by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Bar Membership for Joseph Alfred Colagiovanni, Jr.)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation.. (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by structurlam Mass Timber Corporation Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/5/2020) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/5/2020) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Rudolph and Sletten, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14780077.). Filed bystructurlam Mass Timber Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dhillon, Navtej) (Filed on 8/5/2020) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less