This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2020 at 10:05:41 (UTC).

STROWMATT v. SEVIER

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 STROWMATT filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against SEVIER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02611

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TIMOTHY E. STROWMATT

New Castle, IN 47362

Respondent

MARK SEVIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

David C. Dickmeyer

Attorney at INDIANA ATTORNEY GENERAL

Indiana Government Center South, 5Th Floor, 302 West Washington St.

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

Eric Antonio Pagnamenta

Attorney at INDIANA ATTORNEY GENERAL

Indiana Government Center South, 5Th Floor, 302 West Washington St.

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of TIMOTHY E. STROWMATT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Dickmeyer on behalf of Respondent MARK SEVIER. (Dickmeyer, David) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Antonio Pagnamenta on behalf of Respondent MARK SEVIER. (Pagnamenta, Eric) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (State Conviction) - Timothy E. Stowmatt's's petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges the petitioner's conviction and sentence in Indiana state court case number 71D02-0404-FC-00119. Respondent is ORDERED to enter an appearance by 11/9/2020. If respondent argues that all claims in the petition are subject to one of the procedural bars for dismissal outlined in Rule 5(b), respondent is ORDERED to file a motion to dismiss based on a complete procedural bar by 12/9/2020. If Track 1 does not apply, respondent is ORDERED to answer the petition by 12/30/2020. The Court does not anticipate extending respondent's deadlines absent respondent specifically setting forth extraordinary circumstances (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION AND DEADLINES). Copy to Petitioner via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 10/28/2020.(MAC) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

3 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by TIMOTHY E. STROWMATT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by TIMOTHY E. STROWMATT. (Filing fee $5, receipt number IP071129) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of TIMOTHY E. STROWMATT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Dickmeyer on behalf of Respondent MARK SEVIER. (Dickmeyer, David) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Antonio Pagnamenta on behalf of Respondent MARK SEVIER. (Pagnamenta, Eric) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (State Conviction) - Timothy E. Stowmatt's's petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges the petitioner's conviction and sentence in Indiana state court case number 71D02-0404-FC-00119. Respondent is ORDERED to enter an appearance by 11/9/2020. If respondent argues that all claims in the petition are subject to one of the procedural bars for dismissal outlined in Rule 5(b), respondent is ORDERED to file a motion to dismiss based on a complete procedural bar by 12/9/2020. If Track 1 does not apply, respondent is ORDERED to answer the petition by 12/30/2020. The Court does not anticipate extending respondent's deadlines absent respondent specifically setting forth extraordinary circumstances (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION AND DEADLINES). Copy to Petitioner via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 10/28/2020.(MAC) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by TIMOTHY E. STROWMATT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by TIMOTHY E. STROWMATT. (Filing fee $5, receipt number IP071129) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. Dickmeyer