This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 07:37:05 (UTC).

STROTHER v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 STROTHER filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06715

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHANIE S. STROTHER

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED

COOK GROUP INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller

2425 East Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Louis Carl Schneider

Attorney at THOMAS LAW OFFICES, PLLC

250 East Fifth Street, Suite 440

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Cook Group Incorporated

1 #3

Summons Cook Incorporated

1 #4

Summons Cook Medical Incorporated

1 #5

Summons Cook Medical, LLC

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#3

(#3) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 187) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2570 Cook Medical, Inc., IVC Filters Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. Case transferred to the Southern District of Indiana and assigned to the Honorable Richard L. Young.(P,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/7/2022.] (Entered: 02/04/2022)

4 #4

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/7/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#10

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INC, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00311-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00313-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00351-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00367-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00383-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00386-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00388-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00398-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06716-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06718-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06721-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06724-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06726-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06727-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06728-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06729-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06732-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#11

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INC, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00311-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00313-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00351-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00367-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00383-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00386-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00388-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00398-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06716-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06718-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06721-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06724-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06726-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06727-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06728-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06729-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06732-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STEPHANIE STROTHER.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by STEPHANIE STROTHER. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INC, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00311-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00313-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00351-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00367-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00383-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00386-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00388-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00398-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06716-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06718-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06721-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06724-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06726-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06727-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06728-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06729-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06732-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INC, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00311-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00312-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00313-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00351-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00367-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00383-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00386-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00388-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00398-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06716-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06718-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06719-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06721-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06724-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06726-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06727-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06728-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06729-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06732-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff STEPHANIE STROTHER. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by STEPHANIE STROTHER.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docket(#6) Remark - Case Transferred In from District of Arizona, Cause No. 2:22-cv-58 on 2/3/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6711-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Maryland, Cause No. 8:22-cv-84 on 2/3/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6712-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of New York, Cause No. 1:22-cv-55 on 2/3/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6713-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Ohio, Cause No. 3:21-cv-2255 on 2/4/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6714-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Northern District of Ohio, Cause No. 4:22-cv-78 on 2/7/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6715-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Ohio, Cause No. 1:22-cv-28 on 2/7/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-2716-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06711-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06712-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06713-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06714-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06715-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06716-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/7/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 4:22-cv-00078. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 187) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2570 Cook Medical, Inc., IVC Filters Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. Case transferred to the Southern District of Indiana and assigned to the Honorable Richard L. Young.(P,R) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/7/2022.] (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, and Cook Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (G,M) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/7/2022.] (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (G,M) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/7/2022.] (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketJudge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (G,M) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/7/2022.] (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11223092.. Filed by Stephanie S. Strother. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cook Group Incorporated, #3 Summons Cook Incorporated, #4 Summons Cook Medical Incorporated, #5 Summons Cook Medical, LLC) (Schneider, Louis) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 2/7/2022.] (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant