This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2022 at 08:45:02 (UTC).

Strong v. Indiana Department of Correction et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 Strong filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Indiana Department of Correction. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon E DeGuilio and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00428

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon E DeGuilio

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andre Strong

Defendants

Indiana Department of Correction

William Hyatte

John Doe Guardsman 1

John Doe Inmate 1

John Doe Inmate 2

John Doe Inmate 3

Jacob Tague

Hensley

Callaway

Jordan Amaly

Grove

Rennsler

T Riggle

Shawna Morson

Moore

Wexford of Indiana LLC

Noe Marandet

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrea L Ciobanu

Attorney at Ciobanu Law PC

902 66Th St

Indianapolis, IN 46220

Defendant Attorneys

Erica L Sawyer

Attorney at Indiana Attorney General's Office - IAG/302

302 W Washington St 5Th Fl

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

Heather T Gilbert

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP - Mer/IN

233 E 84Th Dr Ste 305

Merrillville, IN 46410

Taylor L Rasey

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP - Mer/IN

233 E 84Th Dr Ste 305

Merrillville, IN 46410

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea L Ciobanu on behalf of Andre Strong (Ciobanu, Andrea) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica L Sawyer on behalf of Hensley, William Hyatte, T Riggle (Sawyer, Erica) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#5

(#5) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Hensley, William Hyatte, T Riggle ; answer due by July 22, 2022. (Sawyer, Erica) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather T Gilbert on behalf of Noe Marandet, Wexford of Indiana LLC (Gilbert, Heather) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor L Rasey on behalf of Noe Marandet, Wexford of Indiana LLC (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Noe Marandet, Wexford of Indiana LLC. (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer, #1 Complaint by Defendants Hensley, William Hyatte, T Riggle. (Sawyer, Erica) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Noe Marandet, Wexford of Indiana LLC. (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Noe Marandet, Wexford of Indiana LLC. (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Noe Marandet, Wexford of Indiana LLC. (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Noe Marandet, Wexford of Indiana LLC. (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer, #1 Complaint Hensley, William Hyatte, T Riggle answer due 8/21/2022. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/25/22. (slm) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer, #1 Complaint by Defendants Hensley, William Hyatte, T Riggle. (Sawyer, Erica) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Noe Marandet/ Wexford of Indiana LLC answer due 7/27/2022. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/5/22. (slm) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Noe Marandet, Wexford of Indiana LLC. (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor L Rasey on behalf of Noe Marandet, Wexford of Indiana LLC (Rasey, Taylor) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather T Gilbert on behalf of Noe Marandet, Wexford of Indiana LLC (Gilbert, Heather) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Hensley answer due 7/22/2022; William Hyatte answer due 7/22/2022; Indiana Department of Correction answer due 7/22/2022; T Riggle answer due 7/22/2022. (mlc) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Hensley, William Hyatte, T Riggle ; answer due by July 22, 2022. (Sawyer, Erica) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica L Sawyer on behalf of Hensley, William Hyatte, T Riggle (Sawyer, Erica) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Jordan Amaly, Callaway, John Doe, Grove, Hensley, William Hyatte, Indiana Department of Correction, Noe Marandet, Moore, Shawna Morson, Rennsler, T Riggle, Jacob Tague, Wexford of Indiana LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Docket**NEW CASE** Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (shk) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea L Ciobanu on behalf of Andre Strong (Ciobanu, Andrea) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4933639.), filed by Andre Strong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Ciobanu, Andrea) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Callaway is a litigant

Latest cases where Hensley is a litigant

Latest cases where WEXFORD OF INDIANA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GROVE LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AKA GFM LLC is a litigant