This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2019 at 07:31:03 (UTC).

Stromquist v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 Stromquist filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02536

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry Stromquist

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas William Arbon

Attorney at Law Offices of Ben C Martin

3710 Rawlins St., Ste. 1230

Dallas, TX 75219

Ben C Martin

Attorney at Martin Baughman PLLC

3710 Rawlins St., Ste. 1230

Dallas, TX 75219

William T. Dowd

Attorney at DOWD AND DOWD, P.C.

211 N. Broadway, Suite 4050

St. Louis, MO 63102

Laura J Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman, PLLC

3710 Rawlins Street, Suite 1230

Dallas, TX 75219

Laura Greene Lumaghi

Attorney at DOWD AND DOWD, P.C.

211 N. Broadway, Suite 4050

St. Louis, MO 63102

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at NELSON, MULLINS, RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

201 17Th St. Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Lori Gail Cohen

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

3333 Piedmont Rd., Ne, Suite 2500

Atlanta, GA 30305

John Andrew Wharton

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

1144 15Th Street, Suite 3300

Denver, CO 80202

Tomas Leonard

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

2101 L Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20037

Kara T. Stubbs

Attorney at BAKER AND STERCHI, LLC

2400 Pershing Rd., Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2533

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

10 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

10 #1

List of Bar Memberships

#10

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER: Following a telephone conference with counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within ten (10) days from the date of this Order, the parties shall meet and confer and submit to the Court a proposed scheduling plan addressing additional discovery, dispositive motions and trial. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/8/19. (JAB) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ENTRY of Appearance by Laura Greene Lumaghi for Plaintiff Terry Stromquist. (Lumaghi, Laura) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ENTRY of Appearance by Laura J Baughman for Plaintiff Terry Stromquist. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a joint status conference by telephone is set in this matter for Friday, November 8, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel participating in the telephone conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810-9415. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/4/19. (KKS) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ENTRY of Appearance by John Andrew Wharton for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Wharton, John) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Tomas Leonard for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Leonard, Tomas) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • ***REMARK - IT IS NOT NECESSARY TO FILE PRO HAC MOTIONS IN THESE CASES SINCE THEY ARE PART OF AN MDL CASE. ATTORNEY HAS BEEN NOTIFIED AND THE PRO HAC FEES WILL BE REFUNDED. (KXS) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lori G. Cohen by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Cohen, Lori) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/26/19. (JAB) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lori G. Cohen. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7483277) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 List of Bar Memberships, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cohen, Lori) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Richard B. North, Jr. by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara) ; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/24/2019. (CLO) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENTRY of Appearance by William T. Dowd for Plaintiff Terry Stromquist. (Dowd, William) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Richard B. North, Jr. by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Kara T. Stubbs for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (DLB) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01314. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-01314-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16577415 filed by Terry Stromquist. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William T. Dowd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura G. Lumaghi