This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 11:43:12 (UTC).

Strobel v. Burgess et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 Strobel filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Burgess. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04073

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Strobel

Vermillion, SD 57069

Eric J. Strobel

Vermillion, SD 57069

Defendants

Green Pride, LLC

BWMartin, LLC

Wade Burgess

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Meghann M. Joyce

Attorney at Goosmann Law Firm

5010 South Minnesota Avenue, Suite 100

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) BRIEF by Defendant Wade Burgess in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Reply) (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#13

(#13) (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Strobel Aff. in Opp. to Motion to Dismiss by Eric J. Strobel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Strobel Aff., Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. E) (Strobel, Eric) Modified on 7/1/2019 (SAC). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , and Improper Venue by BWMartin, LLC, Wade Burgess, Green Pride, LLC. (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , and Improper Venue Memo in Opposition filed by Eric J. Strobel. (Strobel, Eric) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

13 #5

Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. E

15 #4

Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. D

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400049684) filed by Eric Strobel. (SLT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2019: #1 Attachments) (SLT). (Entered: 04/05/2019)

13 #2

Exhibit Strobel Aff., Ex. B

13 #3

Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. C

#11

(#11) DECLARATION of Jonathan A. Strauss re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , and Improper Venue, #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hennepin Co. Complaint 6.4.12, #2 Exhibit B - Hennepin Co. Answer & 1st Amended Counterclaim 11.29.12, #3 Exhibit C - Hennepin Co. Answer to 1st Amended Counterclaim 12.12.12) (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

15 #2

Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. B

15 #3

Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. C

15 #5

Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. E

#12

(#12) (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Memo in Opposition by Eric J. Strobel. (Strobel, Eric) Modified on 7/1/2019 (SAC). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#15

(#15) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , and Improper Venue Affidavit of Eric Strobel in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Eric J. Strobel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. E) (Strobel, Eric) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

13 #1

Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. A

15 #1

Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. A

13 #4

Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. D

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) BRIEF by Defendant Wade Burgess in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Reply) (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , and Improper Venue Affidavit of Eric Strobel in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Eric J. Strobel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. E) (Strobel, Eric) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , and Improper Venue Memo in Opposition filed by Eric J. Strobel. (Strobel, Eric) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Filing Error: #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Strobel, Eric) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Strobel Aff. in Opp. to Motion to Dismiss by Eric J. Strobel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Strobel Aff., Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Strobel Aff. Ex. E) (Strobel, Eric) Modified on 7/1/2019 (SAC). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Memo in Opposition by Eric J. Strobel. (Strobel, Eric) Modified on 7/1/2019 (SAC). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DECLARATION of Jonathan A. Strauss re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , and Improper Venue, #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hennepin Co. Complaint 6.4.12, #2 Exhibit B - Hennepin Co. Answer & 1st Amended Counterclaim 11.29.12, #3 Exhibit C - Hennepin Co. Answer to 1st Amended Counterclaim 12.12.12) (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DECLARATION of Wade Burgess re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , and Improper Venue, #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email 6.2.12) (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BRIEF by Defendants BWMartin, LLC, Wade Burgess, Green Pride, LLC re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , and Improper Venue, #1 Complaint (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , and Improper Venue by BWMartin, LLC, Wade Burgess, Green Pride, LLC. (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Green Pride, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BWMartin, LLC for Green Pride, LLC. (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by BWMartin, LLC. (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Meghann M. Joyce on behalf of BWMartin, LLC, Wade Burgess, Green Pride, LLC. (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Electronically File Documents in CM/ECF. The Clerks Office shall arrange to train the pro se filer on how to e-file documents and issue the pro se filer a CM/ECF login and password after the training is completed. The ability of the pro se filer to e-file documents may be revoked anytime the Court deems it justified. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/11/2019. (SLT) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER Received from Eric J. Strobel to Clerk of U.S. District Court. (SLT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2019: #1 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) (SLT). Modified docket text to add corrected on 4/10/2019 (SAC). (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Electronically File Documents. Pro se party Eric Strobel will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case, but must wait for a Court ruling regarding e-filing. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. by Eric Strobel. (SLT) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400049684) filed by Eric Strobel. (SLT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2019: #1 Attachments) (SLT). (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.