This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2021 at 09:06:39 (UTC).

Stringer v. CSM Bakery Solutions LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Stringer filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CSM Bakery Solutions LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Norton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01716

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marissa Stringer

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores East LP

CSM Bakery Solutions LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin George Hales

Defendant Attorney

William Walton Silverman

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Documents

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CSM Bakery Solutions LLC.(Silverman, William) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by CSM Bakery Solutions LLC.(Silverman, William) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/13/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/7/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 9/7/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/12/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/15/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/16/2021, Discovery due by 4/4/2022, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 3/18/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2022, ADR Statement due by 5/1/2022, Mediation Due by 5/31/2022, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 7/7/2021 (jbry, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East LP.(Silverman, William) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wal-Mart Stores East LP.(jbry, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clarendon County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-14-00406. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9894771), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(jbry, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less