This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2019 at 07:00:51 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.186.62

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98 207 186 62. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03690

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Defendant

John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.186.62

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lincoln Dee Bandlow

Attorney at Law Offices of Lincoln Bandlow, PC

1801 Century Park East, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement - Demand For Jury Trial against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.186.62 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13467949.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit A-E Declarations In Support

5 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#6

(#6) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to Register of Copyrights). (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#7

(#7) Ex Parte Application For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/13/2019) (Entered: 07/13/2019)

7 #2

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Ex Parte Application For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/13/2019) (Entered: 07/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to Register of Copyrights). (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement - Demand For Jury Trial against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.207.186.62 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13467949.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less