This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 15:23:32 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.174.118.71

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76 174 118 71. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06262

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry J. Hatter, Jr

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Defendant

John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.174.118.71

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lincoln D Bandlow

Attorney at Law Offices of Lincoln Bandlow PC

1801 Century Park East Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Plaintiff's Application for Leave to TakeEarly Discovery #9 by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: For the reasons that follow, the court grants plaintiff's application, but with certain additional protective measures. (See document for details.) (es) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-00787 TJH(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue and Judge Dolly M. Gee to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06262 TJH(SPx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

9 #3

Proposed Order

9 #2

Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support

9 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

#9

(#9) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) and John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Plaintiff's Application for Leave to TakeEarly Discovery #9 by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: For the reasons that follow, the court grants plaintiff's application, but with certain additional protective measures. (See document for details.) (es) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-00787 TJH(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue and Judge Dolly M. Gee to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06262 TJH(SPx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) and John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27203926 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less