This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 13:19:28 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.103.236.62

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76 103 236 62. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alex G. Tse. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04710

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alex G. Tse

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Defendant

John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.103.236.62

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lincoln Dee Bandlow

Attorney at Law Offices of Lincoln Bandlow, PC

1801 Century Park East, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting #8 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support

#8

(#8) Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2020 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) Modified on 7/15/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.103.236.62 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14692362.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting #8 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. (agtlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING A COPYRIGHT. The provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508 require the submission of a report to the Register of Copyrights. Please e-file a proposed Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright form AO 121 using the event Civil Events Other Filings Notices Notice (Other), within five days of this notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. John Doe is the defendant and should not be entered as "Other Affiliate". Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2020 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) Modified on 7/15/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 76.103.236.62 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14692362.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less