This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2019 at 07:02:49 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.34.154.130

Case Summary

On 07/21/2019 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73 34 154 130. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael E. Hegarty and Marcia S. Krieger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02096

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

Presiding Judge

Marcia S. Krieger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Defendant

John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.34.154.130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lincoln Dee Bandlow

Attorney at Lincoln Bandlow PC, Law Offices of

1801 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Exhibit A-C Declarations in Support

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/21/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT - Action for Damages For Property Rights Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.34.154.130 (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6800804)Attorney Lincoln Dee Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/21/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Before A Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C Declarations in Support, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Before A Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/7/2019.(tsher, ) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

8 #2

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Before A Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/7/2019.(tsher, ) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM regarding #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Before A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/6/2019. Text Only Entry (msklc4, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Before A Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C Declarations in Support, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Marcia S. Krieger. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/22/2019. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge who is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2; (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause; (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions; (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions; (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding; and (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/22/2019. Text Only Entry (msklc4) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rvill, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT - Action for Damages For Property Rights Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.34.154.130 (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6800804)Attorney Lincoln Dee Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 07/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.