This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2020 at 07:53:02 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.189.241.101

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73 189 241 101. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05912

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Defendant

John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.189.241.101

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lincoln Dee Bandlow

Attorney at Law Offices of Lincoln Bandlow, PC

1801 Century Park East, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER. In the attached order, the court grants #11 the defendant's ex parte application for leave to serve a third-party subpoena.(lblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Exhibit A-E Declarations In Support

#11

(#11) MOTION for Discovery For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/23/2020. Replies due by 10/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#9

(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement - Demand For Jury Trial against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.189.241.101 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14848882.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER. In the attached order, the court grants #11 the defendant's ex parte application for leave to serve a third-party subpoena.(lblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Discovery For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/23/2020. Replies due by 10/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 9/11/2020) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING A COPYRIGHT. The provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508 require the submission of a report to the Register of Copyrights. Please e-file a proposed Reporton the Filing or Determination of an Action or AppealRegarding a Copyright form AO 121 using the event Civil Events Other Filings Other Documents - Copyright, within five days of this notice.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/8/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement - Demand For Jury Trial against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.189.241.101 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14848882.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less