This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2019 at 07:30:46 (UTC).

STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 72.76.207.84

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 72 76 207 84. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Hammer and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-16182

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC

Defendant

JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 72.76.207.84

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN C. ATKIN

Attorney at THE ATKIN FIRM, LLC

55 Madison Avenue, Suite 400

Morristown, NJ 07960

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) LETTER OPINION AND ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/23/2019. (sm) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

4 #6

Text of Proposed Order

3 #1

Complaint

3 #2

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Greg Lansky, #3 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #4 Exhibit C -- Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #5 Exhibit D -- Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(ATKIN, JOHN) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

4 #4

Exhibit C -- Declaration of John S. Pasquale

#3

(#3) AO121 Copyright Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (bt, ) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ATKIN, JOHN) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

4 #1

Brief

4 #2

Exhibit A -- Declaration of Greg Lansky

4 #5

Exhibit D -- Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 72.76.207.84 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9859985) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ATKIN, JOHN) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

4 #7

Certificate of Service

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER OPINION AND ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/23/2019. (sm) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Greg Lansky, #3 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #4 Exhibit C -- Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #5 Exhibit D -- Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(ATKIN, JOHN) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO121 Copyright Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (bt, ) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ATKIN, JOHN) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 72.76.207.84 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9859985) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ATKIN, JOHN) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less