This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 13:19:59 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 174.62.95.35

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 174 62 95 35. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04709

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Defendant

John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 174

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lincoln Dee Bandlow

Attorney at Law Offices of Lincoln Bandlow, PC

1801 Century Park East, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/17/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

6 #1

Complaint

#6

(#6) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT [REDACTED VERSION] against Strike 3 Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14692322.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/12/2020) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/17/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT [REDACTED VERSION] against Strike 3 Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14692322.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less