This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2020 at 08:18:18 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Paul Oetken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-08826

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Paul Oetken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacqueline Marie James

Attorney at The James Law Firm

445 Hamilton Avenue, Suie 1102

White Plains, NY 10601

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER: granting #6 Letter Motion for Discovery. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff is allowed to conduct immediate discovery on Verizon Fios with a subpoena under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 seeking John Doe's name and current and permanent address. The subpoena shall have a copy of this order attached. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall immediately serve a copy of this order on Verizon Fios and that Verizon Fios shall serve a copy of this order on John Doe. Verizon Fios may serve John Doe using any reasonable means, including written notice sent to John Doe's last known address, transmitted either by first-class mail or via overnight service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any information ultimately disclosed to Plaintiff in response to a Rule 45 subpoena may be used by Plaintiff solely for the purpose of protecting its rights as set forth in its complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to close Docket No. 6. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/29/2020) (ama) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#5

(#5) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22262558)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: granting #6 Letter Motion for Discovery. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff is allowed to conduct immediate discovery on Verizon Fios with a subpoena under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 seeking John Doe's name and current and permanent address. The subpoena shall have a copy of this order attached. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall immediately serve a copy of this order on Verizon Fios and that Verizon Fios shall serve a copy of this order on John Doe. Verizon Fios may serve John Doe using any reasonable means, including written notice sent to John Doe's last known address, transmitted either by first-class mail or via overnight service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any information ultimately disclosed to Plaintiff in response to a Rule 45 subpoena may be used by Plaintiff solely for the purpose of protecting its rights as set forth in its complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to close Docket No. 6. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/29/2020) (ama) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22262558)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less