This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2020 at 08:17:32 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-08818

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacqueline Marie James

Attorney at The James Law Firm

445 Hamilton Avenue, Suie 1102

White Plains, NY 10601

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE granting #6 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. FIND, ORDER AND ADJUDGE: 1. Plaintiff established that "good cause" exists for it to serve a third party subpoena on Verizon Fios (hereinafter the "ISP"). See Arista Records, LLC v. Doe 3, 604 F.3d 110 (2d Cir. 2010) (citing Sony Music Entm't v. Does 1-40, 326 F. Supp. 2d 556, 564-65 (S.D.N.Y. 2004)); Malibu Media, LLC v. John Does 1-11, 2013 WL 3732839 (S.D.N.Y. 2013) (same); John Wiley & Sons, Inc. v. Doe Nos. 1-30, 284 F.R.D. 185, 189 (S.D.N.Y. 2012) (same). 2. Plaintiff may serve the ISP with a Rule 45 subpoena commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address as set forth in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall attach to any such subpoena a copy of this Order. The motion at Dkt. No. 6 is GRANTED. The above text is adopted as an Order of the Court. SO ORDERED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Dkt. No. 6. (And as further set forth herein.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/29/2020) (jca) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/5/2020) (ks) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

7 #3

Exhibit C

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#5

(#5) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22261722)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/5/2020) (ks) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE granting #6 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. FIND, ORDER AND ADJUDGE: 1. Plaintiff established that "good cause" exists for it to serve a third party subpoena on Verizon Fios (hereinafter the "ISP"). See Arista Records, LLC v. Doe 3, 604 F.3d 110 (2d Cir. 2010) (citing Sony Music Entm't v. Does 1-40, 326 F. Supp. 2d 556, 564-65 (S.D.N.Y. 2004)); Malibu Media, LLC v. John Does 1-11, 2013 WL 3732839 (S.D.N.Y. 2013) (same); John Wiley & Sons, Inc. v. Doe Nos. 1-30, 284 F.R.D. 185, 189 (S.D.N.Y. 2012) (same). 2. Plaintiff may serve the ISP with a Rule 45 subpoena commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address as set forth in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall attach to any such subpoena a copy of this Order. The motion at Dkt. No. 6 is GRANTED. The above text is adopted as an Order of the Court. SO ORDERED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Dkt. No. 6. (And as further set forth herein.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/29/2020) (jca) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(jgo) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC..(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22261722)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less