This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:24:20 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00961

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dawn Marie Sciarrino

Attorney at Sciarrind & Shubert, PLLC (TN)

330 Franklin Road, Suite 135A-133

Brentwood, TN 37027-3280

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granted as amended re #5 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 09/09/2020. (see order for details/changes) (dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re #5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference Waiver of Oral Argument (Sciarrino, Dawn) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sciarrino, Dawn) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

4 #1

Complaint

#4

(#4) Report on the filing or determination of a Copyright action. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(aott,8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC AO 121 - Report on Filing of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sciarrino, Dawn) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Sciarrino, Dawn) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7359890.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sciarrino, Dawn) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granted as amended re #5 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 09/09/2020. (see order for details/changes) (dvanm, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re #5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference Waiver of Oral Argument (Sciarrino, Dawn) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sciarrino, Dawn) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sciarrino, Dawn) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on the filing or determination of a Copyright action. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(aott,8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC AO 121 - Report on Filing of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sciarrino, Dawn) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Sciarrino, Dawn) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7359890.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sciarrino, Dawn) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less