This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2019 at 07:16:00 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05858

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacqueline Marie James

Attorney at The James Law Firm

445 Hamilton Avenue, Suie 1102

White Plains, NY 10601

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

6 #3

Exhibit C

#5

(#5) MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#4

(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER terminating #5 Motion for Discovery. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant may proceed anonymously as John Doe in this action unless and until the Court orders otherwise. 2. Plaintiff may not initiate settlement discussions prior to service of the Complaint without leave of this Court. Nevertheless, if Defendant initiates such discussions, Plaintiff is permitted to participate therein and to settle the case. 3. Plaintiff may immediately serve a Rule 45 subpoena on the ISP seeking only the name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned the IP address set forth in the Complaint in this action. Plaintiff is not permitted to subpoena the Defendants telephone number or email address. The subpoena must attach a copy of this Order, along with the attached Notice to Defendant. Plaintiff may also serve a Rule 45 subpoena in the same manner as above on any other ISP that is identified in response to a subpoena as a provider of Internet services to the Defendant. 4. The ISP shall have 60 days from the date of service of the Rule 45 subpoena and this Order upon it to serve Defendant with a copy of the subpoena, a copy of this Order, and a copy of the attached Notice to Defendant. The ISP may serve Defendant using any reasonable means, such as written notice to a last known address, transmitted either by first-class mail or via overnight service. 5. Defendant shall have 60 days from the date of service of the Rule 45 subpoena and this Order upon her or him to file any motion with this Court contesting the subpoena (including a motion to quash or to modify the subpoena). The ISP may not turn over Defendant's information to Plaintiff prior to the close of this 60-day period. Additionally, if Defendant or the ISP files a motion to quash the subpoena, the ISP may not turn over any information to Plaintiff until the issue has been resolved and the Court has issued an order instructing the ISP to resume in turning over the requested discovery. All other provisions as further set forth in this order. Plaintiff is further directed to file a status letter with the Court no later than December 20, 2019. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Dkt. 5. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/23/2019) (js) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17124520)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER terminating #5 Motion for Discovery. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendant may proceed anonymously as John Doe in this action unless and until the Court orders otherwise. 2. Plaintiff may not initiate settlement discussions prior to service of the Complaint without leave of this Court. Nevertheless, if Defendant initiates such discussions, Plaintiff is permitted to participate therein and to settle the case. 3. Plaintiff may immediately serve a Rule 45 subpoena on the ISP seeking only the name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned the IP address set forth in the Complaint in this action. Plaintiff is not permitted to subpoena the Defendants telephone number or email address. The subpoena must attach a copy of this Order, along with the attached Notice to Defendant. Plaintiff may also serve a Rule 45 subpoena in the same manner as above on any other ISP that is identified in response to a subpoena as a provider of Internet services to the Defendant. 4. The ISP shall have 60 days from the date of service of the Rule 45 subpoena and this Order upon it to serve Defendant with a copy of the subpoena, a copy of this Order, and a copy of the attached Notice to Defendant. The ISP may serve Defendant using any reasonable means, such as written notice to a last known address, transmitted either by first-class mail or via overnight service. 5. Defendant shall have 60 days from the date of service of the Rule 45 subpoena and this Order upon her or him to file any motion with this Court contesting the subpoena (including a motion to quash or to modify the subpoena). The ISP may not turn over Defendant's information to Plaintiff prior to the close of this 60-day period. Additionally, if Defendant or the ISP files a motion to quash the subpoena, the ISP may not turn over any information to Plaintiff until the issue has been resolved and the Court has issued an order instructing the ISP to resume in turning over the requested discovery. All other provisions as further set forth in this order. Plaintiff is further directed to file a status letter with the Court no later than December 20, 2019. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at Dkt. 5. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/23/2019) (js) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Marie James to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17124520)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.