This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2020 at 07:11:41 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08163

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 207.181.230.242

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Robert Herman

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

130 E. Randolph St., Suite 3900

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:For the reasons explained in the Court's order dated 8/24/15 in case number 15 C 5500, the Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to take early discovery #7 . No appearance on the motion is required. However, Plaintiff may not publish the identity of the Doe defendant in any way without further leave of court. Additionally, within three business days after the information requested in the subpoena is produced, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide the person identified by that information with a copy of this order, and a copy of the 8/24/15 order entered in case number 15 C 5500, via overnight delivery. The Doe defendant so identified shall have 30 days from the date he or she receives a copy of the orders to file an objection or other appropriate motion with this Court. The Doe defendant may proceed in this case by pseudonym (based on his or her Doe number or IP address) until further order. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Robert Herman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/21/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

8 #3

Exhibit C

8 #2

Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLCFor Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

6 #1

Attachment

#6

(#6) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(pk, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Timothy Robert Herman (Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT - Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16530298. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:For the reasons explained in the Court's order dated 8/24/15 in case number 15 C 5500, the Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to take early discovery #7 . No appearance on the motion is required. However, Plaintiff may not publish the identity of the Doe defendant in any way without further leave of court. Additionally, within three business days after the information requested in the subpoena is produced, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide the person identified by that information with a copy of this order, and a copy of the 8/24/15 order entered in case number 15 C 5500, via overnight delivery. The Doe defendant so identified shall have 30 days from the date he or she receives a copy of the orders to file an objection or other appropriate motion with this Court. The Doe defendant may proceed in this case by pseudonym (based on his or her Doe number or IP address) until further order. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Robert Herman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/21/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLCFor Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(pk, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Timothy Robert Herman (Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT - Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16530298. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Timothy) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less