This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 08:38:00 (UTC).

Stricker v. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2006-HE8 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-HE8

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Stricker filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC TRUST 2006-HE8 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-HE8. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jason K. Pulliam and Henry J. Bemporad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01398

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jason K. Pulliam

Referral Judge

Henry J. Bemporad

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Stricker

San Antonio, TX 78250

Defendants

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2006-HE8 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-HE8

1001 Mckinney St., Ste. 1500

Houston, TX 77002

Michael Zientz

Suzanne Suarez

Eldon L. Youngblood

Clay Golden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Brian A. Paino

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford

18201 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 350

Irvine, CA 92612

Matthew A. Knox

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

1001 Mckinney, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2006-HE8 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-HE8 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12909454), filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2006-HE8 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-HE8. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement)(Knox, Matthew) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 3/2/2020,, Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/2/2020,, Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Consent Form)(wg) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #5

Supplement

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,, by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2006-HE8 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-HE8. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Knox, Matthew) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2006-HE8 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-HE8. (Paino, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

5 #1

Supplement Consent Form

3 #1

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit C

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ( Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 3/2/2020,, Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/2/2020,, Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad,). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Consent Form)(wg) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,, by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2006-HE8 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-HE8. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Knox, Matthew) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2006-HE8 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-HE8. (Paino, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2006-HE8 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-HE8 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12909454), filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2006-HE8 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-HE8. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement)(Knox, Matthew) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.