This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 08:32:46 (UTC).

Strenfel v. T-Mobile USA Inc

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Strenfel filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against T-Mobile USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00900

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Strenfel

Defendant

T-Mobile USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexis Wood

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RONALD MARRON

651 Arroyo Drive

San Diego, CA 92103

Amanda Grace Fiorilla

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Christian Levis

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Kas Gallucci

Attorney at Law Offices of Ronald A. Marron

651 Arroyo Drive

San Diego, CA 92103

Margaret C. MacLean

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Ron Marron

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RONALD A MARRON

651 Arroyo Drive

San Diego, CA 92103

Manish Borde

Attorney at BORDE LAW PLLC

600 Stewart St, Suite 400

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

Steve Y Koh

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Kristine McAlister Brown

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD LLP (GA)

1201 W Peachtree St, One Atlantic Ctr

Atlanta, GA 30309-3432

Kathleen M O'Sullivan

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Lauren Jeffers Tsuji

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

34 #1

*Restricted*

34 #34

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

33 #1

CTO email

33 #33

Main Document

#31

(#31) Stipulated MOTION and Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/04/2021)

28 #1

Proposed Order

28 #28

Main Document

26 #1

Proposed Order

26 #26

Main Document

#7

(#7) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura, as this is a related matter. (KAM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christian Levis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7240429 (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#5

(#9) ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Amanda Grace Fiorilla for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#4

(#8) ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Margaret C MacLean for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc (SG) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 21-cv-01118 21-cv-01119 21-cv-01130 21-cv-01137 21-cv-01138 21-cv-01139 21-cv-01148 21-cv-01153 21-cv-01157 21-cv-01161 21-cv-01169 21-cv-01179 21-cv-01181 21-cv-01183 21-cv-00189 21-cv-01190, by Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel. (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/2021)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#35) ORDERED Defendant T-Mobile's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Doc. #28) is DENIED AS MOOT AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE to reassertion at the appropriate time in MDL 3019. Signed on 1/22/2022 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01208. (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting Parties' #31 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer; striking Defendant's #26 Motion to Stay. This matter is STAYED pending a ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) on the pending motion to transfer in In re: T-Mobile Customer Data Sec. Breach Litig., MDL No. 3019. Briefing on Defendant's motion to compel arbitration (Dkt. No. #28 ) is STAYED in light of this Order staying this action. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Stipulated MOTION and Order to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML's Ruling on Transfer, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel, to #26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DECLARATION of Christopher Muzio filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc re #28 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M)(Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DECLARATION of Kristine McAlister Brown filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc re #26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Amanda Grace Fiorilla for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Margaret C MacLean for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura, as this is a related matter. (KAM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christian Levis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7240429 (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Amanda G. Fiorilla FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7240366 (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Margaret C. MacLean FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7240304 (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc (SG) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketJudge J Richard Creatura added. (SG) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 21-cv-01118 21-cv-01119 21-cv-01130 21-cv-01137 21-cv-01138 21-cv-01139 21-cv-01148 21-cv-01153 21-cv-01157 21-cv-01161 21-cv-01169 21-cv-01179 21-cv-01181 21-cv-01183 21-cv-00189 21-cv-01190, by Plaintiff Daniel Strenfel. (Borde, Manish) [Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7237152) Attorney Manish Borde added to party Daniel Strenfel(pty:pla), filed by Daniel Strenfel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Borde, Manish)[Transferred from wawd on 12/17/2021.] (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Jeffers Tsuji