This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2020 at 08:33:37 (UTC).

Streeter v. Perkins and Will Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Streeter filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Perkins and Will Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is John C Coughenour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01325

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John C Coughenour

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Douglas Streeter

Defendants

Perkins and Will Inc

Does 1-23

Does 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Beth E Terrell

Attorney at TERRELL MARSHALL LAW GROUP PLLC

936 N 34Th St, Ste 300

Seattle, WA 98103-8869

Kathleen M Lucas

Attorney at THE LUCAS LAW FIRM

354 Pine St 4Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

Meredith Ann Smith

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C. (SEA)

520 Pike Street, Suite 2300

Seattle, WA 98101-4099

Michael Anthony Griffin

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C. (SEA)

520 Pike Street, Suite 2300

Seattle, WA 98101-4099

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kathleen M. Lucas FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Douglas Streeter (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6629472 (Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#5

(#5) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ST) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dar Al-Handasah Consultants Shair and Partners Holdings Ltd for Perkins and Will Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Perkins and Will Inc (Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Brodie Stephens re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Perkins and Will Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Michael A. Griffin re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Perkins and Will Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-01848-1 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6576375), filed by Perkins and Will Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kathleen M Lucas for plaintiff Douglas Streeter, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kathleen M. Lucas FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Douglas Streeter (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6629472 (Terrell, Beth) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/14/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/21/2020, Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2020.(GT) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ST) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketU.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (ST) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dar Al-Handasah Consultants Shair and Partners Holdings Ltd for Perkins and Will Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Perkins and Will Inc (Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Brodie Stephens re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Perkins and Will Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Michael A. Griffin re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Perkins and Will Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-01848-1 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6576375), filed by Perkins and Will Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERKINS + WILL A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beth E. Terrell