This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2021 at 07:35:34 (UTC).

Streeter et al v. USAA General Indemnity Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/24/2020 Streeter filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against USAA General Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana L. Christensen and Kathleen L. DeSoto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-00188

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

Referral Judge

Kathleen L. DeSoto

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Streeter

Katja Streeter

Defendants

John Does 1-10

USAA General Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy E. Dailey

Attorney at MILODRAGOVICH DALE STEINBRENNER

620 High Park Way, Po Box 4947

Missoula, MT 59806-4947

Michael P. Sherwood

Attorney at MILODRAGOVICH DALE STEINBRENNER

620 High Park Way, Po Box 4947

Missoula, MT 59806-4947

Lon J. Dale

Attorney at MILODRAGOVICH DALE STEINBRENNER

620 High Park Way, Po Box 4947

Missoula, MT 59806-4947

Defendant Attorneys

Hannah R. Seifert

Attorney at SPENCER FANE, LLP

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Jeremy A. Moseley

Attorney at SPENCER FANE, LLP

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#6

#7

#8

#10

#11

#12

#13

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Judge Christensen. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Judge DeSoto. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/12/2021. (APP) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant USAA GIC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address by Hannah R. Seifert (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy A. Moseley on behalf of USAA General Indemnity Company (Moseley, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by David Streeter, Katja Streeter re #8 Mailing of Consent (Sherwood, Michael) Modified on 1/22/2021 to reflect deleting consent as these do not get filed by the parties (APP). (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mailing of Consent Judge DeSoto as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Michael P. Sherwood, Timothy E. Dailey, Lon J. Dale, Hannah R. Seifert. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/8/2021. (APP) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer USAA General Indemnity Company answer due 2/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/19/2021. (TXB) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA General Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for USAA General Indemnity Company.. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Hannah R. Seifert appearing for Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, Summons served on Cassie Moyer, Agent of Corporation Service Company as Registered Agent of USAA General Indemnity Company on 12/30/2020, filed by David Streeter, Katja Streeter. (Sherwood, Michael) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/23/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/23/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/23/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/28/2020. (SMD) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to USAA General Indemnity Company. (Summons may be downloaded from CM/ECF by Plaintiffs' counsel for service.) (NOS) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $402; receipt number 0977-2592806. (NOS) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against USAA General Indemnity Company and John Does 1-10 filed by David and Katja Streeter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannah R. Seifert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Andrew Moseley