This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2020 at 08:43:43 (UTC).

Street v. Welltower Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Street filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Welltower Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin W. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01112

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin W. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charlotte Street

Defendants

Welltower, Inc. doing business as Sunrise Senior Living doing business as Brighton Gardens of Stamford

Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ikechukwu Umeugo

Attorney at Umeugo & Assoc.

620 Boston Post Rd., Po Box 26373

West Haven, CT 06516

Defendant Attorney

Sarah R. Skubas

Attorney at Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, CT

90 State House Sq., 8Th Fl.

Hartford, CT 06103-3708

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time until September 25, 2020 (Unopposed) to file the parties joint Rule 26(f) Report of Parties Planning Meeting by Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc.. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint with Special Defenses. by Welltower, Inc..(Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#19

(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Welltower, Inc., filed by Charlotte Street.(Umeugo, Ikechukwu) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#16

(#17) ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (ECF No. #16 ) is hereby GRANTED absent objection. The plaintiff shall docket her amended complaint forthwith. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/3/2020. (Clough, M.) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#7

(#7) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2020, Discovery due by 2/4/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/5/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Welltower Inc.. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Welltower Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Welltower Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Welltower Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, CERTIFICATE OF FILING REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Skubas on behalf of Welltower Inc. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#5) NOTICE by Welltower Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 4:00 p.m. before Judge Alvin W. Thompson. Dial-in instructions have been emailed to counsel of record. Anyone wishing to observe this proceeding should contact chambers at 860-240-3224 to request the dial-in instructions. (Clough, M.) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/25/2020 (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER: The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #21 ) is hereby GRANTED. The parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report by September 25, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/21/2020. (Clough, M.) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time until September 25, 2020 (Unopposed) to file the parties joint Rule 26(f) Report of Parties Planning Meeting by Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc.. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint with Special Defenses. by Welltower, Inc..(Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Welltower, Inc., filed by Charlotte Street.(Umeugo, Ikechukwu) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Welltower, Inc. to 9/14/2020. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RDER: The Defendant's Second Unopposed Request for Enlargement of Time in Which to Respond to Operative Complaint (ECF No. #16 ) is hereby GRANTED to September 14, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/3/2020. (Clough, M.) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (ECF No. #16 ) is hereby GRANTED absent objection. The plaintiff shall docket her amended complaint forthwith. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/3/2020. (Clough, M.) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/5/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/5/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2020, Discovery due by 2/4/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/5/2020. (Agati, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketJudge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Welltower Inc.. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Welltower Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Welltower Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Welltower Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, CERTIFICATE OF FILING REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Skubas on behalf of Welltower Inc. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Welltower Inc. from Superior Court, JD of New Haven at New Haven, case number NNH-CV20-6106136-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6015233, filed by Welltower Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLTOWER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sunrise Senior Living Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ikechukwu Umeugo