This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2021 at 08:56:38 (UTC).

Street et al v. Amazon.com Services Inc et al

Case Summary

On July 8, 2021, Mary and Matthew Street (“Plaintiffs” and/or the “Street Plaintiffs”), on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated (“Class Members”), represented by Jason T. Dennett and Rebecca Luise Solomon of Tousley Brain Stephens, filed a personal property fraud lawsuit against Amazon.com Services, Inc. and Amazon Digital Services, Inc. (collectively “Amazon” or “Defendants”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief along with damages, among other relief, for the Defendants’ alleged unfair, deceptive, and/or fraudulent business practices, resulting in alleged losses and injuries to Plaintiffs and class members. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Washington. 

 

Pursuant to Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(2) and (b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiffs bring this action on behalf of All persons in the United States who bought or acquired and use an Amazon Sidewalk Device.

 

In their complaint, the Plaintiffs alleged that, “Amazon manufactured, marketed, and sold the Echo and Ring devices. Embedded within Sidewalk Devices is a technology that enables those Sidewalk Devices to connect to other Echo and Ring devices nearby through their Bluetooth connections, creating a new, shared network. Together, these connections create a stronger “mesh” network with long range connectivity that would otherwise be expensive to create. Amazon bypasses the expense of creating such an expensive network, however, by having Sidewalk tap into Plaintiffs’ and Class Members’ private Internet connections, using portions of their Internet bandwidth to maintain connections between the Sidewalk Devices.”

 

The Plaintiffs further alleged that, “Amazon activated Sidewalk on or about June 8, 2021, automatically connecting its Sidewalk Devices by default without first seeking consumers’ consent to share their Internet bandwidth.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “As a result of Amazon’s unfair, deceptive, and/or fraudulent business practices, owners of Sidewalk Devices, including Plaintiffs and Class Members, have suffered an ascertainable loss and injury in fact; are at imminent risk of future harm, including increased risk to the security of their personal data; and otherwise have been harmed by Amazon’s conduct.”

 

The Plaintiff lists out three claims for relief on behalf of Plaintiffs and the Class. The first claim is for alleged violation of the Washington Consumer Protection Act, RCW §§ 19.86.101, et seq. The second claim is for alleged theft of telecommunication services pursuant to RCW § 9A.56.268. The third claim is for alleged unjust enrichment, as the Defendants receive a benefit from the use of customer Sidewalk Devices and internet bandwidth that is not contemplated in the sale contract between Amazon, on the one hand, and Plaintiffs and Class Members, on the other, for such devices. 

 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs requested the Court for certification of this case as a class action on behalf of Plaintiffs and the Class; to pass a judgment for appropriate declaratory and injunctive relief; for general compensatory damages and special and consequential damages; for civil penalties and prejudgment and post-judgment interest; for attorney fees, witness fees, and costs of litigation; and for punitive and exemplary damages, where applicable, according to proof to be determined at trial.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00912

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mary Street

Matthew Street

Defendants

Amazon.com Services, Inc.

Amazon Digital Services, Inc.

Amazon.com Services Inc

Amazon Digital Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradford Rothwell Sohn

Attorney at THE BRAD SOHN LAW FIRM PLLC

1600 Ponce Deleon Blvd Ste 1205

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Graham B. LippSmith

Attorney at LIPPSMITH LLP

555 S Flower St Ste 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jaclyn L. Anderson

Attorney at LIPPSMITH LLP

555 S Flower St Ste 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

MaryBeth LippSmith

Attorney at LIPPSMITH LLP

555 S Flower St Ste 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jason T Dennett

Attorney at TOUSLEY BRAIN STEPHENS

1200 Fifth Ave Ste 1700

Seattle, WA 98101

Rebecca Luise Solomon

Attorney at TOUSLEY BRAIN STEPHENS

1200 Fifth Ave Ste 1700

Seattle, WA 98101

Defendant Attorneys

AnnaLise Bender-Brown

Attorney at FENWICK & WEST (WA)

1191 Second Ave, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

David W Feder

Attorney at FENWICK & WEST (NY)

902 Broadway 14Th Fl

New York, NY 10010

Jedediah Wakefield

Attorney at FENWICK & WEST (SF)

555 California St, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Laurence F. Pulgram

Attorney at FENWICK & WEST (SF)

555 California St, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Brian D Buckley

Attorney at FENWICK & WEST (WA)

1191 Second Ave, 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MINUTE ORDER: At the parties request, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 9/30/2021. Failure to adhere to this deadline may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#22

(#22) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY AnnaLise Bender-Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Digital Services Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7212547 (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#20

(#20) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David W. Feder FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Digital Services Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7209150 (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#14

(#17) ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jedediah Wakefield for Defendants Amazon Digital Services Inc, and Amazon.com Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#12

(#16) ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Laurence F. Pulgram for Defendants Amazon Digital Services Inc, and Amazon.com Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#6

(#15) ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Bradford Rothwell Sohn for plaintiffs Mary Street and Matthew Street, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#4

(#8) ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jaclyn L. Anderson for plaintiffs Mary Street and Matthew Street, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#3

(#7) ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Graham B. LippSmith for plaintiffs Mary Street and Matthew Street, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SG) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

1 #3

Summons to Amazon Digital Services, Inc.

1 #2

Summons to Amazon.com Services, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7157612), filed by Matthew Street, Mary Street. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Amazon.com Services, Inc., #3 Summons to Amazon Digital Services, Inc.)(Dennett, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/8/2021 to flatten malformed PDF) (KB). (Entered: 07/08/2021)

10 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney AnnaLise Bender-Brown for defendants Amazon Digital Services Inc and Amazon.com Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE ORDER: At the parties request, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 9/30/2021. Failure to adhere to this deadline may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY AnnaLise Bender-Brown FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Digital Services Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7212547 (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER re #20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David W Feder for Defendants Amazon Digital Services Inc and Amazon.com Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David W. Feder FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon Digital Services Inc, Amazon.com Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7209150 (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Amazon Digital Services Inc mailed on 7/27/2021 (Dennett, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Amazon.com Services Inc mailed on 7/27/2021 (Dennett, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jedediah Wakefield for Defendants Amazon Digital Services Inc, and Amazon.com Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Laurence F. Pulgram for Defendants Amazon Digital Services Inc, and Amazon.com Services Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Bradford Rothwell Sohn for plaintiffs Mary Street and Matthew Street, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney MaryBeth LippSmith for plaintiffs Mary Street and Matthew Street, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jaclyn L. Anderson for plaintiffs Mary Street and Matthew Street, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Graham B. LippSmith for plaintiffs Mary Street and Matthew Street, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brad R. Sohn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Mary Street, Matthew Street (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7158915 (Dennett, Jason) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MaryBeth LippSmith FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Mary Street, Matthew Street (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7158912 (Dennett, Jason) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jaclyn L. Anderson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Mary Street, Matthew Street (Fee Paid) Receipt No. CWAWDC-7158903 (Dennett, Jason) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Graham B. LippSmith FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Mary Street, Matthew Street (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7158868 (Dennett, Jason) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SG) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketJudge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SG) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon Digital Services, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7157612), filed by Matthew Street, Mary Street. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Amazon.com Services, Inc., #3 Summons to Amazon Digital Services, Inc.)(Dennett, Jason) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/8/2021 to flatten malformed PDF) (KB). (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Digital Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurence F. Pulgram Esquire