This case was last updated from PACER on 09/24/2021 at 06:58:55 (UTC).

Streamscale, Inc. v. Cloudera, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Streamscale, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cloudera, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00198

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Streamscale, Inc.

Defendants

Automatic Data Processing, Inc.

Experian plc

Cloudera, Inc.

Wargaming (Austin), Inc.

ADP, Inc.

Intel Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jamie H. McDole

Attorney at Winstead PC

1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Nadia Elena Haghighatian

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

1722 Routh St., Ste 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Austin Teng

Attorney at Thompson and Knight LLP

1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael D. Karson

Attorney at Winstead PC

One Arts Plaza, 1722 Routh St, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Phillip B. Philbin

Attorney at Winstead PC

1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Kao

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5998

Brock S. Weber

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

4 Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Steven P. Tepera

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 1700

Austin, TX 78701

Christopher S. Ponder

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

379 Lytton Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Harper Batts

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

379 Lytton Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Jennifer Klein Ayers

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, 24Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

Jose Carlos Villarreal

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

500 W. 2Nd Street, Suite 1900

Austin, TX 78701

Jennifer J. John

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

2600 El Camino Real, Suite 400

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Joseph Taylor Gooch

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

One Front Street, Suite 3500

San Franciso, CA 94111

Sonal N. Mehta

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

2600 El Camino Real Suite 400

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Vikram Iyer

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Austin Michael Schnell

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

401 Congress Ave, Suite 1700

Austin, TX 78701

Amanda L. Major

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Annaleigh E. Curtis

Attorney at WilmerHale

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Brian Christopher Nash

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

401 Congress Avenue, Suite 1700

Austin, TX 78701-3797

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#83

(#83) SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 3/25/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2022. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 1/20/2023. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#82

(#82) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Intel Corporation, re #75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Intel Corporation (Nash, Brian) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#81

(#81) STIPULATION (Joint) re: ECF No. 72 by Streamscale, Inc.. (Karson, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#80

(#80) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Streamscale, Inc.. (Karson, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#79

(#79) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Streamscale, Inc., re #75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Intel Corporation (Karson, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#78

RESTRICTED

75 #2

Exhibit B

75 #1

Exhibit A

#75

(#75) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nash, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H - US10666296

1 #7

Exhibit G - Petition for Correction

1 #6

Exhibit F - US10291259

1 #5

Exhibit E - Petition for Correction

1 #4

Exhibit D - US10003358

1 #3

Exhibit C - US9385759

1 #1

Exhibit A - US8683296

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14546109). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Streamscale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US8683296, #2 Exhibit B - US9160374, #3 Exhibit C - US9385759, #4 Exhibit D - US10003358, #5 Exhibit E - Petition for Correction, #6 Exhibit F - US10291259, #7 Exhibit G - Petition for Correction, #8 Exhibit H - US10666296, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDole, Jamie) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

136 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 3/25/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2022. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 1/20/2023. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Intel Corporation, re #75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Intel Corporation (Nash, Brian) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) STIPULATION (Joint) re: ECF No. 72 by Streamscale, Inc.. (Karson, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Streamscale, Inc.. (Karson, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Streamscale, Inc., re #75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Intel Corporation (Karson, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 8-5-21, Proceedings Transcribed: Discovery Hearing (Zoom). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 9/8/2021, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2021, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2021, (kd) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed Scheduling Order by Streamscale, Inc.. (Karson, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Massimo Ciccarelli on behalf of Streamscale, Inc.. Attorney Massimo Ciccarelli added to party Streamscale, Inc.(pty:pla) (Ciccarelli, Massimo) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nash, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) ANSWER to #67 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by ADP, Inc..(Moffa, Matthew) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip B. Philbin on behalf of Streamscale, Inc. (Philbin, Phillip) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Intel Corporation. (lad) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Cloudera, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Automatic Data Processing, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Streamscale, Inc.. for Cloudera, Inc., Automatic Data Processing, Inc., Wargaming (Austin), Inc. and Intel Corporation (McDole, Jamie) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (am) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (McDole, Jamie) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Streamscale, Inc.. (McDole, Jamie) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14546109). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Streamscale, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US8683296, #2 Exhibit B - US9160374, #3 Exhibit C - US9385759, #4 Exhibit D - US10003358, #5 Exhibit E - Petition for Correction, #6 Exhibit F - US10291259, #7 Exhibit G - Petition for Correction, #8 Exhibit H - US10666296, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDole, Jamie) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cloudera, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WARGAMING.NET LIMITED, a Cyprus limited company is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOMATIC DATA PROCESSING, INC., is a litigant