This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2022 at 08:24:29 (UTC).

Strausser v. Taco Bell of America, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Strausser filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Taco Bell of America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Bernard A. Friedman and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-10387

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bernard A. Friedman

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sierra Strausser

Defendant

Taco Bell of America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian L. Fantich

Attorney at Law Office of Michael G. Kelman, P. C.

30903Northwestern Highway, Suite 270

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

Defendant Attorney

John M. McManus

Attorney at McManus Law

117 W. Fourth St., Suite 201

Royal Oak, MI 48067

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Taco Bell of America, LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 22-000755-NO. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Disclosure of Corporate Interest) (McManus, John) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

1 #1

Document Continuation Disclosure of Corporate Interest

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 3/1/2022 (DPer) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#3

(#3) STIPULATED ORDER REMANDING CASE to Wayne County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (DPer) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE remanding case to WAYNE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (DPer) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Wayne County Circuit Court of receipt of #4 Notice of Remand. (DPer) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Wayne County Circuit Court of receipt of #4 Notice of Remand. (DPer) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE remanding case to WAYNE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (DPer) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATED ORDER REMANDING CASE to Wayne County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (DPer) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee for Civil Case Received by Taco Bell of America, LLC. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8804224 - Fee: 402 re #2 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. (McManus, John) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 3/1/2022 (DPer) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Taco Bell of America, LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 22-000755-NO. Fee Required - Fee Not Paid. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Disclosure of Corporate Interest) (McManus, John) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Taco Bell of America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M. McManus