This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:27:02 (UTC).

Stratton v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Stratton filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00120

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Stratton

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brittany Lauren Clark

Attorney at Baron & Budd

3102 Oak Lawn Ave, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

Thomas M Sims

Attorney at Baron and Budd, P.C.

3102 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorney

Joe G. Hollingsworth

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Monsanto Company filed by Gary Stratton. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10357382) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Clark, Brittany) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (ndt) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-02509. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2741, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of California. (aaa) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Sims (Sims, Thomas) (Filed on 1/24/2020) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Sims (Sims, Thomas) (Filed on 1/24/2020) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: Texas Northern, 3:19-cv-02509, Stratton v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-00120-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 170 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-02509. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Interdistrict Transfer to Northern District of California; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Northern Districit of California. (aaa) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2741, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of California. (aaa) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (ndt) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Monsanto Company filed by Gary Stratton. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10357382) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Clark, Brittany) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.