This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2022 at 07:56:26 (UTC).

Stratford v. Avon Products, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 Stratford filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Avon Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Philip Calabrese. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02414

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Philip Calabrese

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sylvia Stratford

Defendants

John Crane Inc.

Brenntag North America, Inc.

GG of Florida, Inc.

Goulds Pumps LLC

Padagis Michigan, LLC

Playtex Marketing Corporation

Playtex Products, LCC

Smiths Group PLC

Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC

ViacomCBS, Inc.

Walmart Inc.

Avon Products, Inc.

Brenntag Specialties, Inc.

Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.

BW/IP Internation, Inc.

Charles B. Chrystal Company, Inc.

Colgate-Palmolive Company

Crane Co.

Davion Inc.

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher J. Hickey

Attorney at McDermott & Hickey

20525 Center Ridge Road

Rocky River, OH 44116

Kevin E. McDermott

Attorney at McDermott & Hickey

20525 Center Ridge Road

Rocky River, OH 44116

Anthony Gallucci

Attorney at McDermott & Hickey

20525 Center Ridge Road

Rocky River, OH 44116

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew C. O'Connell

Attorney at Sutter O'Connell - Cleveland

3600 Erieview Tower, 1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Nathan F. Studeny

Attorney at Sutter O'Connell - Cleveland

3600 Erieview Tower, 1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Audrey K. Bentz

Attorney at Janik - Cleveland

9200 South Hills Blvd.

Cleveland, OH 44147

Steven G. Janik

Attorney at Janik - Cleveland

9200 South Hills Blvd.

Cleveland, OH 44147

M. Laura Lopez

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

James N. Kline

Attorney at Bonezzi, Switzer, Polito & Hupp - Cleveland

1300 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Sandra Becher Sommers

Attorney at McMahon DeGulis - Cleveland

650 Caxton Bldg., 812 Huron Road

Cleveland, OH 44115

Bradley R. Copeland

Attorney at Gordon, Rees Scully Mansukhani

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Tyler G. Tarney

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Cathy R. Gordon

Attorney at Post & Schell - Pittsburgh

One Oxford Centre, 301 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Edward A. Smallwood, II

Attorney at Post & Schell

One Oxford Center, 301 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Other Attorneys

Jenifer E. Novak

Attorney at Frantz Ward

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Richik Sarkar

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl - Cleveland

1001 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Edward O. Patton

Attorney at Mansour Gavin

1400 North Point Tower, 1001 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Kenneth E. Smith

Attorney at Mansour Gavin

1400 North Point Tower, 1001 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Michael P. Quinlan

Attorney at Mansour Gavin

1400 North Point Tower, 1001 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44114

Samuel R. Martillotta

Attorney at Mansour Gavin

1001 Lakeside Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#77

(#77) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Tarney, Tyler) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#76

(#76) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Tarney, Tyler) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#75

(#75) Order: The Court ORDERS Defendant John Crane Inc. to submit information from which the Court can determine whether complete diversity exists such that the Court has original jurisdiction no later than March 7, 2022. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/24/2022. (Y,A) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

74 #1

Exhibit Ex 1 - State Court Docket

74 #74

Main Document

33 #4

Exhibit 4 - William Powell SOS

33 #3

Exhibit 3- Williamm Powell Summons Service

33 #2

Exhibit 2 - Kroger Summons Service

33 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Case Info and Docket

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,Ja) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

1 #7

Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #6

Notice of Appearance

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit B - Affidavit of George L. Springs

1 #3

Exhibit A2 - Civil Case Docket Page

1 #2

Exhibit A1 - Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Nathan F. Studeny

1 #1

Main Document

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Tarney, Tyler) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Tarney, Tyler) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Order: The Court ORDERS Defendant John Crane Inc. to submit information from which the Court can determine whether complete diversity exists such that the Court has original jurisdiction no later than March 7, 2022. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/24/2022. (Y,A) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Reply in support of #33 Motion to remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - State Court Docket)(Hickey, Christopher) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Avon Products, Inc.. (Kline, James) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document]: Defendant Avon Products, Inc.'s motion for an extension until 7 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to the complaint is unopposed and granted (ECF No. #72 ). Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 2/23/2022.(Y,A) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Unopposed Motion for extension of time to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Avon Products, Inc.. (Kline, James) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Perrigo Company. (Garner, Richard) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Crossclaims Filed or To Be Filed filed by Naterra International, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Quinlan, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Naterra International, Inc.. (Quinlan, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance by Jenifer E. Novak filed by on behalf of Dolgencorp, LLC. (Novak, Jenifer) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dolgencorp, LLC. (Novak, Jenifer) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Answer to Complaint filed by ViacomCBS, Inc. (Schuster, Richard) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Appearance by Richard D. Schuster, Perry W. Doran, II, and Stephen C. Musilli filed by on behalf of Viacomcbs, Inc.. (Schuster, Richard) Modified text on 1/11/2022 (S,SR). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketRequest to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: duplicate. Receipt #: 5735841, filed by John Crane Inc.. (O'Connell, Matthew) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by John Crane Inc.. (Studeny, Nathan) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,Ja) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,Ja) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketJudge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (L,Ja) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from The Court of Common Pleas, Cuyahoga County, Ohio, case number CV-21-957443 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11197123.. Filed by John Crane Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Nathan F. Studeny, #2 Exhibit A1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit A2 - Civil Case Docket Page, #4 Exhibit B - Affidavit of George L. Springs, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Studeny, Nathan) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Smiths Group PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Playtex Products, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where G.G. OF FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVION INC. is a litigant