This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/15/2020 at 09:51:22 (UTC).

Stratford Insurance Company v. Shorewood Forest Utilities Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 Stratford Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Shorewood Forest Utilities Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Martin and Philip P Simon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00372

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E Martin

Presiding Judge

Philip P Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Stratford Insurance Company

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Greg Schafer

Shorewood Forest Utilities Inc

Carlotta Holmes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Sheri Bradtke McNeil

Attorney at Kopka Pinkus Dolin PC - CP/IN

9801 Connecticut Dr

Crown Point, IN 46307

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Timothy S Schafer

Attorney at Schafer and Schafer LLP

3820 East Us 30

Merrillville, IN 46410

Paul B Poracky

Attorney at Koransky Bouwer & Poracky PC

425 Joliet St Ste 425

Dyer, IN 46311

Glenn S Vician

99 East 86Th Ave Ste 2 G

Merrillville, IN 46410

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Exhibit Group Exhibit 1

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

15 #9

Exhibit 9

15 #8

Exhibit 8

#15

1 #16

Proposed Summons Shorewood Forest Utilities, Inc.

1 #15

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #13

Exhibit G(1)

1 #12

Exhibit F

1 #10

Exhibit D

1 #9

Exhibit C

1 #8

Exhibit B(5)

1 #7

Exhibit B(4)

1 #5

Exhibit B(2)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BRIEF in Support of #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carlotta Holmes, Greg Schafer, Shorewood Forest Utilities Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Poracky, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Carlotta Holmes, Greg Schafer, Shorewood Forest Utilities Inc. (Poracky, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B Poracky on behalf of Shorewood Forest Utilities Inc (Poracky, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn S Vician on behalf of Carlotta Holmes, Greg Schafer (Vician, Glenn) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn S Vician on behalf of Carlotta Holmes, Greg Schafer (Vician, Glenn) ***FILING ERROR; ATTORNEY NOTIFIED TO REFILE; REFILED AT #17 *** Modified on 12/7/2020 (ace). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) COUNTERCLAIM < against Stratford Insurance Company, filed by Carlotta Holmes, Greg Schafer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Schafer, Timothy) Modified on 12/7/2020 to include jury demand in text(kjp). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Schafer on behalf of Carlotta Holmes, Greg Schafer (Schafer, Timothy) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shorewood Forest Utilities Inc. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Proposed Summons filed by Stratford Insurance Company. (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Proposed Summons filed by Stratford Insurance Company. (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Defendants Schafer and Holmes response to Plaintiff's Complaint due on or before 12/8/2020. (shk) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Carlotta Holmes, Greg Schafer re #1 Complaint,, of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Poracky, Paul) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B Poracky on behalf of Carlotta Holmes, Greg Schafer (Poracky, Paul) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docket(#5) TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 10/30/2020 before Judge Philip P Simon. (In related case 2:20CV368). Pla appeared by atty Glenn S. Vician. Dft appeared by atty Sheri Bradtke McNeil. Discussion on case (2:20CV368). The parties agree that the best action would be to stay the case (2:20CV368). The court will issue an order. (Court Reporter Stacy Drohosky.) (nac) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stratford Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group Inc for Stratford Insurance Company.. (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Carlotta Holmes, Greg Schafer, Shorewood Forest Utilities Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketRelated Case Remark - Counsel has indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet that this case is related to Case No. 2:20cv368 PPS-JEM. (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketJudge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (jld) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sheri Bradtke McNeil on behalf of Stratford Insurance Company (Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Carlotta Holmes, Greg Schafer, Shorewood Forest Utilities Inc( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4373152.), filed by Stratford Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A(1), #3 Exhibit A(2), #4 Exhibit B(1), #5 Exhibit B(2), #6 Exhibit B(3), #7 Exhibit B(4), #8 Exhibit B(5), #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F, #13 Exhibit G(1), #14 Exhibit G(2), #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Proposed Summons Shorewood Forest Utilities, Inc., #17 Proposed Summons Holmes, #18 Proposed Summons Schafer)(Bradtke McNeil, Sheri) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stratford Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheri Bradtke McNeil