This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:15:18 (UTC).

Strange v. Prep at Home LLC

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Strange filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Prep at Home LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirtan Khalsa and Steven C. Yarbrough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00709

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kirtan Khalsa

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clinton Strange

Greenwood, LA 71033

Defendants

Prep at Home LLC a New Mexico Domestic Limited Liability Company doing business as The Contractors School

Prep at Home LLC doing business as The Contractors School

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sidney Childress

P.O. Box 2327

Santa Fe, NM 8711287504

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint filed by Clinton Strange. (Childress, Sidney) Modified docket text on 8/26/2020 (dr). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 12) is granted. Plaintiff may file the Second Amended Complaint attached to his Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint within 5 days of entry of this Order. (kmt) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit proposed Second Amended Complaint

#12

(#12) MOTION to Amend/Correct by Clinton Strange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Childress, Sidney) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Sidney Childress on behalf of Clinton Strange (Childress, Sidney) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#9

(#9) CM/ECF Pro Se Notification Form electing to receive notification via U.S. postal mail by Clinton Strange. (aek) Modified on 8/18/2020 (arp). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Amended Complaint by Clinton Strange. (aek) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Prep at Home LLC., filed by Clinton Strange. (aek) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE re Request for Issuance of Summons by Clinton Strange. (ln) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#5

(#5) Plaintiff's Judicial Notice of Mailing by Clinton Strange. (aek) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of The Telephone Consumer Protection Act of 1991 against Prep at Home LLC, filed by Clinton Strange. (ln) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Prep at Home LLC. (arp) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint filed by Clinton Strange. (Childress, Sidney) Modified docket text on 8/26/2020 (dr). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 12) is granted. Plaintiff may file the Second Amended Complaint attached to his Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint within 5 days of entry of this Order. (kmt) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Amend/Correct by Clinton Strange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Childress, Sidney) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Clinton Strange voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Childress, Sidney)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Sidney Childress on behalf of Clinton Strange (Childress, Sidney) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CM/ECF Pro Se Notification Form electing to receive notification via U.S. postal mail by Clinton Strange. (aek) Modified on 8/18/2020 (arp). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Amended Complaint by Clinton Strange. (aek) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Prep at Home LLC., filed by Clinton Strange. (aek) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Prep at Home LLC. (ln) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE re Request for Issuance of Summons by Clinton Strange. (ln) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Plaintiff's Judicial Notice of Mailing by Clinton Strange. (aek) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket(#4) Filing Fee: $ 400, receipt number ALB047315 (snw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of The Telephone Consumer Protection Act of 1991 against Prep at Home LLC, filed by Clinton Strange. (ln) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less