This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 18:55:18 (UTC).

Strain Jr. et al v. East Baton Rouge Parish School Board et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 Strain Jr filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against East Baton Rouge Parish School Board. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00253

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pamela S. Ray

Donald A. Strain Jr.

Fran S. Bolton

Scott O. Strain

Defendants

National Maintenance Holding Company, LLC

ExxonMobil Corporation

Anco Insulations, Inc.

Georgia-Pacific, LLC

The McCarty Corporation

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Dow Chemical Company

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.

Jacobs Engineering Group Inc.

General Electric Company

Cargill, Incorporated

Reilly-Benton Co., Inc.

East Baton Rouge Parish School Board

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Viacom, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lawrence G. Gettys

Attorney at Gettys Law Group APLC

9191 Siegen Lane, Building 7

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Kevin James LaMarca

Attorney at The Lanier Law Firm

10940 W. Sam Houston Pkwy N, Ste 100

Houston, TX 77064

Kevin P. Parker

Attorney at Lanier Law Firm

10940 W. Sam Houston Pkwy N., Suite 100

Houston, TX 77064

Sam E. Taylor, II

Attorney at The Lanier Law Firm

10940 W. Sam Houston Pkwy N, Ste 100

Houston, TX 77064

Defendant Attorneys

David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator and Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

John Allain Viator

Attorney at Bienvenu Bonnecaze Foco Viator & Holinga

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Erin Conner Percy

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis

701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139

Carlos A Benach

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jennifer D. Zajac

Attorney at Willngham, Fultz & Cougill LLP

5625 Cypress Creek Parkway, 6Th Floor

Houston, TX 77069

Jamie Morain Zanovec

Attorney at Fultz & Cougill LLP

8550 United Plaza Blvd., Suite 702

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Jennifer Hart McLaughlin

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer & Sommers, LLC

616 Girod Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Annette N. Peltier

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar - B.R.

P. O. Box 4412, 400 Convention Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802-5618

Brittany Holt Alexander

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar

400 Convention Street, Suite 1100

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Jack Brandon Stanley

Attorney at L&B Holdings, LLC

708 Us-190 A

Port Allen, LA 70767

Claire A. Noonan

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Meera Unnithan Sossamon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

John W. Sinnott

Attorney at Irwin, Fritchie, Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

James B. Irwin, V

Attorney at Irwin, Fritchie, Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Other Attorneys

William Glenn Burns

Attorney at Gaudry, Ranson, Higgins & Gremillion, LLC

401 Whitney Avenue, Suite 500

Gretna, LA 70056

Kyle W. Siegel

Attorney at Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, L.L.C.

909 Poydras Street, 24Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70112

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand (certified copy mailed to 19th JDC). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson and Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/8/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#6

(#29) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/08/2019. (NLT) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#27

(#27) Mail Returned as Undeliverable on 23 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mail returned from Leila D'Aquin. Reason: Return to Sender - unable to forward. (EDC) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

26 #6

Exhibit

26 #3

Exhibit

26 #2

Exhibit

26 #1

Exhibit

#26

(#26) REPLY to #18 Opposition to #8 MOTION to Remand and Abstention, filed by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(EDC) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

18 #2

Exhibit

1 #20

Exhibit B - Part 3 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Ban

1 #19

Exhibit B - Part 2 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Ban

1 #18

Exhibit B - Part 1 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Ban

1 #17

Exhibit A - Part 17 - State Court Record

1 #15

Exhibit A - Part 15 - State Court Record

1 #14

Exhibit A - Part 14 - State Court Record

1 #13

Exhibit A - Part 13 - State Court Record

1 #12

Exhibit A - Part 12 - State Court Record

1 #11

Exhibit A - Part 11 - State Court Record

111 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/08/2019. (NLT) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand (certified copy mailed to 19th JDC). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick, Judge Brian A. Jackson and Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/8/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Mail Returned as Undeliverable on 23 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mail returned from Leila D'Aquin. Reason: Return to Sender - unable to forward. (EDC) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) REPLY to #18 Opposition to #8 MOTION to Remand and Abstention, filed by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(EDC) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Opposition to Motion for Remand and Abstention and Exceed the Page Limitation. The clerk is directed to file R. Doc. 24-1 through 24-16 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6-24-2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #24 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand and Abstention and Exceed the Page Limitation MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand and Abstention and Exceed the Page Limitation by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand and Abstention, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 19, #13 Exhibit 20, #14 Exhibit 21, #15 Exhibit 22, #16 Exhibit 23)(LaMarca, Kevin). Added MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on 6/24/2019 (EDC). (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER granting #21 and #22 Motions for Sam E. Taylor, II and Kevin P. Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/7/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #22 MOTION for Kevin P. Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1952689). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #21 MOTION for Sam E. Taylor II to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1952668). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Remand and Abstention in Excess of the Page Limitation by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(KAH) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Remand and Abstention by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr. (Attachments: # STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD (1) Attachment Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File in Excess of the Page Limitation, # STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD (2) Memorandum in Support of Motion for Remand and Abstention, #3 Exhibit 1 - Composite of 37 Remand Orders, #4 Exhibit 2 - Diagnosing Medical, #5 Exhibit 3 - Death Certificate, #6 Exhibit 4 - Scheduling Order, #7 Exhibit 5 - Agreed Motion for Continuance, #8 Exhibit 6 - Status Conference Correspondence, #9 Exhibit 7 - J&Js RFA Responses at RFA no. 12, #10 Exhibit 8 - Imerys Demand Letter)(Gettys, Lawrence). Added MOTION on 5/10/2019 (KAH). Modified on 5/10/2019 to edit the text (KAH). Modified on 5/14/2019 STRICKEN as ordered by rec doc # 11 (ELW). (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of PLAINTIFFS RULE 9027(e)(3) STATEMENT UPON REMOVAL by Fran S. Bolton, Pamela S. Ray, Scott O. Strain, Donald A. Strain Jr. (Gettys, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. responsive pleadings due 5/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/7/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/01/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos) Modified on 5/2/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Sossamon, Meera) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter to Attorney Thomas L. Cougill who is lead counsel for party Reilly-Benton Company, Inc. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 646985. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1933036), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2 - State Court Record, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3 - State Court Record, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4 - State Court Record, #5 Exhibit A - Part 5 - State Court Record, #6 Exhibit A - Part 6 - State Court Record, #7 Exhibit A - Part 7 - State Court Record, #8 Exhibit A - Part 8 - State Court Record, #9 Exhibit A - Part 9 - State Court Record, #10 Exhibit A - Part 10 - State Court Record, #11 Exhibit A - Part 11 - State Court Record, #12 Exhibit A - Part 12 - State Court Record, #13 Exhibit A - Part 13 - State Court Record, #14 Exhibit A - Part 14 - State Court Record, #15 Exhibit A - Part 15 - State Court Record, #16 Exhibit A - Part 16 - State Court Record, #17 Exhibit A - Part 17 - State Court Record, #18 Exhibit B - Part 1 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #19 Exhibit B - Part 2 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #20 Exhibit B - Part 3 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #21 Exhibit B - Part 4 - Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy, #22 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Benach, Carlos) (Attachment 6, 7 and 15 replaced on 4/29/2019 to correct page orientation) (SWE). (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.