This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2022 at 08:00:16 (UTC).

Stragent, LLC v. Volvo Car USA LLC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Stragent, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Volvo Car USA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joshua D. Wolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00293

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joshua D. Wolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stragent, LLC

Defendant

Volvo Car USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

Attorney at O'Kelly & Ernst, LLC

824 N. Market Street, Suite 1001A

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

Lewis E. Hudnell, III

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lewis E. Hudnell, III. Signed by Judge Joshua D. Wolson on 4/18/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lewis E. Hudnell, III - filed by Volvo Car USA LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#13

(#13) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 5/23/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 5/23/2022. Fact Discovery completed by 12/21/2022. Opening Expert Reports due by 2/16/2023. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 3/13/2023. Expert Discovery due by 4/17/2023. Signed by Judge Joshua D. Wolson on 4/11/2022. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00510-JDW, 1:20-cv-00511-JDW, 1:22-cv-00293-JDW (nmg) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#12

(#12) Letter to The Honorable Joshua D. Wolson from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding response to Court's Order dated March 28, 2022 re case management schedule - re #9 Order,, Set Hearings,. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed revised schedule pursuant to the Court's Order of March 28, 2022 to April 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Joshua D. Wolson on 04/04/2022. (smg) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed revised schedule pursuant to the Courts Order of March 28, 2022 to April 5, 2022 - filed by Volvo Car USA LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER, following a conference call with counsel for the Parties, on or before April 1, 2022, Plaintiff Stragent, LLC shall resubmit its technology tutorial. A brief technology tutorial and the Markman hearing will be held on June 29, 2022, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3B, United States District Court, 601 Market Street, Philadelphia, PA 19106. (See Order for further details) Signed by Judge Joshua D. Wolson on 03/28/2022. (smg) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER, the deadline for Defendant Volvo Car USA, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended forty-five (45) days from March 24, 2022 to May 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Joshua D. Wolson on 3/24/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 9, 2022 - filed by Volvo Car USA LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER: DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Joshua D. Wolson of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Michael A Chagares, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 3/14/2022. (rjb) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stragent, LLC. Volvo Car USA LLC served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Volvo Car USA LLC on 3/4/2022. (smg) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,248,477 ; 10,031,790 ; 10,002,036 ; 9,705,765. (smg) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Volvo Car USA LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3817188.) - filed by Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Lewis E. Hudnell, III for Volvo Car USA LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lewis E. Hudnell, III. Signed by Judge Joshua D. Wolson on 4/18/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lewis E. Hudnell, III - filed by Volvo Car USA LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 5/23/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 5/23/2022. Fact Discovery completed by 12/21/2022. Opening Expert Reports due by 2/16/2023. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 3/13/2023. Expert Discovery due by 4/17/2023. Signed by Judge Joshua D. Wolson on 4/11/2022. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00510-JDW, 1:20-cv-00511-JDW, 1:22-cv-00293-JDW (nmg) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter to The Honorable Joshua D. Wolson from Stamatios Stamoulis regarding response to Court's Order dated March 28, 2022 re case management schedule - re #9 Order,, Set Hearings,. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed revised schedule pursuant to the Court's Order of March 28, 2022 to April 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Joshua D. Wolson on 04/04/2022. (smg) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed revised schedule pursuant to the Courts Order of March 28, 2022 to April 5, 2022 - filed by Volvo Car USA LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, following a conference call with counsel for the Parties, on or before April 1, 2022, Plaintiff Stragent, LLC shall resubmit its technology tutorial. A brief technology tutorial and the Markman hearing will be held on June 29, 2022, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3B, United States District Court, 601 Market Street, Philadelphia, PA 19106. (See Order for further details) Signed by Judge Joshua D. Wolson on 03/28/2022. (smg) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joshua D. Wolson - Telephone Conference held on 3/28/2022. (Not on record, time in court 15 minutes) (smg) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER, the deadline for Defendant Volvo Car USA, LLC to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended forty-five (45) days from March 24, 2022 to May 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Joshua D. Wolson on 3/24/2022. (nmg) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 9, 2022 - filed by Volvo Car USA LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Joshua D. Wolson, of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Please include the initials of the Judge (JDW) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00510-JDW, 1:20-cv-00511-JDW, 1:20-cv-00512-JDW, 1:22-cv-00293-JDW (rjb) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Joshua D. Wolson of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Michael A Chagares, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 3/14/2022. (rjb) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stragent, LLC. Volvo Car USA LLC served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Volvo Car USA LLC on 3/4/2022. (smg) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,248,477 ; 10,031,790 ; 10,002,036 ; 9,705,765. (smg) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Volvo Car USA LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3817188.) - filed by Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stragent, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Volvo Car USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lewis Emery Hudnell, III