This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2020 at 09:49:56 (UTC).

Stragent, LLC v. BMW of North America, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 Stragent, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00510

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stragent, LLC

Defendants

BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC

BMW of North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Pazuniak

Attorney at O'Kelly & Ernst, LLC

824 N. Market Street, Suite 1001A

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

Samhitha M. Medatia

Lionel M. Lavenue

Robert B. Cassady

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samhitha M. Medatia, R. Benjamin Cassady and Lionel M. Lavenue - filed by BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Related Cases by BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 6, 2020 - filed by BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Stragent, LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Stragent, LLC. BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stragent, LLC. BMW of North America, LLC served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#4

(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,248,477 ;10,031,790 ;10,002,036 ;9,705,765. (sam) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT- filed with Jury Demand against BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2900205.) - filed by Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Samhitha M. Medatia, Robert B. Cassady, Lionel M. Lavenue for BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC and BMW of North America, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samhitha M. Medatia, R. Benjamin Cassady and Lionel M. Lavenue filed by BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/21/20. (ntl) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Samhitha M. Medatia, R. Benjamin Cassady and Lionel M. Lavenue - filed by BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Related Cases by BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 6, 2020 filed by BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/5/20. (ntl) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 6, 2020 - filed by BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00510-LPS, 1:20-cv-00511-LPS, 1:20-cv-00512-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Stragent, LLC. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed by Stragent, LLC. BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stragent, LLC. BMW of North America, LLC served on 4/16/2020, answer due 5/7/2020. (Pazuniak, George) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (sam) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,248,477 ;10,031,790 ;10,002,036 ;9,705,765. (sam) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sam) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT- filed with Jury Demand against BMW Manufacturing Co., LLC, BMW of North America, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2900205.) - filed by Stragent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(sam) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stragent, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW MANUFACTURING CO. LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Pazuniak