This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2022 at 08:47:39 (UTC).

Strader (ID 66677) v. Kansas, State of et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 Strader ID 66677 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Kansas, State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A. Crow. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-03054

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Crow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James C. Strader

Lansing, KS 66043-0002

Defendants

Kansas, State of

Aramark

Kansas Supreme Court

Reno, County of

Kansas Department of Corrections

Jeff Zmuda

Corizon Health

Centurion

KOSE Union

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibits

#2

(#2) Letter to Clerk from Plaintiff James C. Strader re: #1 Complaint. (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Request to Waive Provisional Statute by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appoint Indigent Counsel by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Vacate and Release From Sentence by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docs. #3 , #4 ) are denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Indigent Counsel (Doc. #5 ) and a Motion to Vacate and Release From Sentence (Doc. #6 ) are denied without prejudice to refiling if Plaintiff submits the filing fee. Plaintiff is granted until April 8, 2022, to submit the $402.00 filing fee. The failure to submit the fee by that date will result in the dismissal of this matter without prejudice and without additional prior notice. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/22/22. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Recusal of Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow and Request for Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse (Doc. #8 ) is denied. Plaintiff is granted until April 8, 2022, to submit the $402.00 filing fee. The failure to submit the fee by that date will result in the dismissal of this matter without prejudice and without additional prior notice. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/29/22. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER ENTERED: This action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 04/11/22. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#11

(#11) JUDGMENT regarding Order #10 dismissing action without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 04/11/22. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JUDGMENT regarding Order #10 dismissing action without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 04/11/22. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER ENTERED: This action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 04/11/22. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse (Doc. #8 ) is denied. Plaintiff is granted until April 8, 2022, to submit the $402.00 filing fee. The failure to submit the fee by that date will result in the dismissal of this matter without prejudice and without additional prior notice. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/29/22. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Recusal of Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow and Request for Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docs. #3 , #4 ) are denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Indigent Counsel (Doc. #5 ) and a Motion to Vacate and Release From Sentence (Doc. #6 ) are denied without prejudice to refiling if Plaintiff submits the filing fee. Plaintiff is granted until April 8, 2022, to submit the $402.00 filing fee. The failure to submit the fee by that date will result in the dismissal of this matter without prejudice and without additional prior notice. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/22/22. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Vacate and Release From Sentence by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appoint Indigent Counsel by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Request to Waive Provisional Statute by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter to Clerk from Plaintiff James C. Strader re: #1 Complaint. (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (smnd) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kansas Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases where Centurion Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where Aramark Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Corizon Health, Inc. is a litigant