This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2022 at 08:24:11 (UTC).

Strader (ID 66677) v. Kansas, State of et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 Strader ID 66677 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Kansas, State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A. Crow. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-03275

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Crow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James C. Strader

Lansing, KS 66043-0002

Defendants

Kansas, State of

Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals

Kansas Department of Corrections

K.O.S.E.

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to appoint federal prosecution and motion to dismiss (Doc. #12 ) is denied in part and granted in part. The motion to appoint federal prosecution is denied. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss this matter without prejudice is granted. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/21/21. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to show cause and motion to recuse (Doc. #11 ) is denied. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/17/21. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to recuse and to present (Doc. #9 ) is denied. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/10/2021. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (jal) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for order (Doc. #7 ) is denied. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/07/21. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER transferring case to the District of Kansas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/30/2021. (jlh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 11/30/2021.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

12 #1

Letter to the Clerk

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) MOTION to Recuse Judge Sam A. Crow and MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Recuse and MOTION to Present by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Order by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's claims concerning the validity of his convictions in Reno County and Johnson County must be presented in habeas corpus and are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is denied. Plaintiff is granted to and including January 3, 2022, to submit the $402.00 filing fee. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/01/21. Mailed to pro se party James Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

5 #1

*Restricted*

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

3 #1

Statement re Assignment of Case Form

3 #3

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to appoint federal prosecution and motion to dismiss (Doc. #12 ) is denied in part and granted in part. The motion to appoint federal prosecution is denied. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss this matter without prejudice is granted. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/21/21. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to show cause and motion to recuse (Doc. #11 ) is denied. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/17/21. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Appoint Federal Prosecution for Criminal Charges and Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Plaintiff James C. Strader; docket sheet mailed to Plaintiff Strader. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Clerk) (smnd) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Recuse Judge Sam A. Crow and MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to recuse and to present (Doc. #9 ) is denied. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/10/2021. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (jal) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Recuse and MOTION to Present by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for order (Doc. #7 ) is denied. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/07/21. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Order by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's claims concerning the validity of his convictions in Reno County and Johnson County must be presented in habeas corpus and are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is denied. Plaintiff is granted to and including January 3, 2022, to submit the $402.00 filing fee. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/01/21. Mailed to pro se party James Strader by regular mail. (smnd) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00340. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (smnd) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER transferring case to the District of Kansas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/30/2021. (jlh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 11/30/2021.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re Magistrate Assignment. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 12/13/2021. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/29/2021. (Attachment: #1 Statement re Assignment of Case Form.) (jlh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 11/30/2021.] (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by James Strader. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (jlh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 11/30/2021.] (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by James Strader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits.) (jlh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 11/30/2021.] (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kansas Department of Corrections is a litigant