This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2021 at 07:24:56 (UTC).

StoryCorp Consulting, Inc. v. John Martin et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 StoryCorp Consulting, Inc filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against John Martin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02891

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

StoryCorp Consulting, Inc.

StoryCorp Consulting, Inc. doing business as Wells Compliance Group

Defendants

John W. Martin

Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275

Mobilitypay Holdings, Inc.

DOES 1 thru 10, inclusive

Content Checked Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Teri T Pham

Attorney at Enenstein Pham and Glass

650 Town Center Drive Suite 840

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Matthew Windom Rosene

Attorney at Enenstein Pham and Glass

650 Town Center Drive Suite 840

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

Craig J Cornwell

Attorney at The Cornwell Firm

777 South Alameda Street 2Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90021

John W Martin

Attorney at Law Office of John W Martin

28126 Peacock Ridge Drive Apt 210

Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) REPLY In Support of Motion To Dismiss First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #18 filed by Defendant John W. Martin. (Cornwell, Craig) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#25

(#25) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #18 filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc.. (Pham, Teri) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#23

(#23) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order attached. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#22

(#22) ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting #20 Request to Substitute Attorney Craig J Cornwell as attorney of record instead of Attorney John W Martin for Mobilitypay Holdings, Inc. (lom) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#21

(#21) ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting #19 Request to Substitute Attorney Craig J Cornwell as attorney of record instead of John W. Martin for Defendant John W Martin. (lom) Modified on 5/14/2021 (lom). (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc.. (Pham, Teri) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc. (Pham, Teri) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc., identifying David Wells. (Pham, Teri) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc.. (Pham, Teri) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc.. (Pham, Teri) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#1

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant John W. Martin and Mobilitypay Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Mobilitypay) (jtil) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY In Support of Motion To Dismiss First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #18 filed by Defendant John W. Martin. (Cornwell, Craig) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #18 filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc.. (Pham, Teri) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #18 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Motion to Dismiss)(Cornwell, Craig) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order attached. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting #20 Request to Substitute Attorney Craig J Cornwell as attorney of record instead of Attorney John W Martin for Mobilitypay Holdings, Inc. (lom) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting #19 Request to Substitute Attorney Craig J Cornwell as attorney of record instead of John W. Martin for Defendant John W Martin. (lom) Modified on 5/14/2021 (lom). (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY John W. Martin as counsel of record to Mobilitypay Holdings filed by Defendant Mobilitypay Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Form G-01 Order for Mobilitypay Holdings re Withdrawal of Counsel) (Martin, John) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY John W. Martin as counsel of record to John W. Martin filed by Defendant John W. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Form G-01 Order for John Martin re Withdrawal of Counsel) (Martin, John) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant John W. Martin, Mobilitypay Holdings, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/11/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES AND FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE., #2 Declaration in Support of Motion, #3 Unredacted Document Notice in Support of Motion, #4 Unredacted Document CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF 13 INTERESTED PARTIES.) (Cornwell, Craig) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #14 , for the following reasons: CM/ECF account in violation of Local Rule 83-2.3. The Court extends the deadline for defendants to respond to the complaint to 5/18/2021. (gk) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant John W. Martin and Mobilitypay Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Mobilitypay) (jtil) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc.. (Pham, Teri) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc. (Pham, Teri) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc., identifying David Wells. (Pham, Teri) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc.. (Pham, Teri) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc.. (Pham, Teri) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31040506 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff StoryCorp Consulting, Inc.. (Attorney Teri T Pham added to party StoryCorp Consulting, Inc.(pty:pla))(Pham, Teri) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTENT CHECKED HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Teri T Pham