This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:03:14 (UTC).

Stormborn Technologies, LLC v. Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Stormborn Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan van Keulen and William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07804

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan van Keulen

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Stormborn Technologies, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Kirk J. Anderson

Attorney at Budo Law PC

5610 Ward Rd., Suite 300

Arvada, CO 80002

Howard L Wernow

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt and Wernow Co., LPA

4940 Munson Street Nw, Aegis Tower - Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Rodeen Talebi

Attorney at Fish and Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Ricardo J. Bonilla

Attorney at Fish and Richardson

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael Alden Vincent

Attorney at Fish and Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish and Richardson - Dallas

1717 Main St., Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#32

(#32) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Howard L. Wernov. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#31

(#31) ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byStormborn Technologies, LLC. (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

30 #3

Exhibit

#29

(#29) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14081616.) filed by Stormborn Technologies, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Filed on 1/17/2020) Modified on 1/21/2020 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#17

(#31) ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byStormborn Technologies, LLC. (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

16 #2

Proposed Order

16 #1

Exhibit 1

#16

(#26) ORDER granting #22 STIPULATION to reset deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 2/4/2020. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/15/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#8

(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#6

(#6) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Stormborn Technologies, LLC (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#4

(#4) ***DUPLICATE ENTRY*** Civil Cover Sheet by Stormborn Technologies, LLC . (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 11/29/2019 (ecgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Stormborn Technologies, LLC . (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

2 #2

Exhibit B - Exemplary Claim Chart

2 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. RE44,199

#2

(#2) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byStormborn Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. RE44,199, #2 Exhibit B - Exemplary Claim Chart)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#1

(#2) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byStormborn Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. RE44,199, #2 Exhibit B - Exemplary Claim Chart)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Howard L. Wernov. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byStormborn Technologies, LLC. (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Stormborn Technologies, LLC. Filed byStormborn Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14081616.) filed by Stormborn Technologies, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Filed on 1/17/2020) Modified on 1/21/2020 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Michael Vincent. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Neil J. McNabnay. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER granting #22 STIPULATION to reset deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 2/4/2020. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/15/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) EXHIBITS re #19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14028138.) filed byTopcon Positioning Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) #19 ) (McNabnay, Neil) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) EXHIBITS re #21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14028172.) filed byTopcon Positioning Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Vincent, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2019
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/30/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • (#7) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/11/2019. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Stormborn Technologies, LLC (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons. (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ***DUPLICATE ENTRY*** Civil Cover Sheet by Stormborn Technologies, LLC . (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 11/29/2019 (ecgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Stormborn Technologies, LLC . (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byStormborn Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. RE44,199, #2 Exhibit B - Exemplary Claim Chart)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13932779.). Filed byStormborn Technologies, LLC. (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less