This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2022 at 09:29:06 (UTC).

Stormborn Technologies LLC v. KVH Industries, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Stormborn Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against KVH Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William P. Dimitrouleas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-62001

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stormborn Technologies LLC

Defendant

KVH Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow Co., LPA

4940 Munson Street Nw, Aegis Tower - Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

Defendant Attorneys

Marissa D Kelley

Attorney at Kelley Legal

401 East Las Olas Blvd., Ste 1400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Mark M. Supko

Attorney at Crowell & Moring, LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Stormborn Technologies LLC. KVH Industries, Inc. served on 11/3/2022, response/answer due 11/28/2022. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#19

(#19) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Mark M. Supko, Esq.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

18 #1

Exhibit Order

18 #18

Main Document

17 #1

Exhibit Certification

17 #17

Main Document

15 #2

Exhibit Order

15 #1

Exhibit Certification

15 #15

Main Document

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to KVH Industries, Inc. (mab) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

1 #6

Summon(s)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Related Cases

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C-Claim Chart

1 #2

Exhibit B-Schilling Declaration w Exhibits

1 #1

Exhibit A-USRE44199E

1 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Stormborn Technologies LLC. KVH Industries, Inc. served on 11/3/2022, response/answer due 11/28/2022. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Mark M. Supko, Esq.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketAttorney Mark M. Supko representing KVH Industries, Inc. (Defendant) Activated. (pt) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE by KVH Industries, Inc. re #17 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark M. Supko. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order) (Kelley, Marissa) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark M. Supko. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by KVH Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 12/2/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Kelley, Marissa) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER denying without prejudice #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Mark M. Supko of Attorney Mark M. Supko representing KVH Industries, Inc. (Defendant). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketAttorney Mark M. Supko representing KVH Industries, Inc. (Defendant) Activated. (pt) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark M. Supko. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-16105902. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by KVH Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 12/1/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Exhibit Order)(Kelley, Marissa) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Stormborn Technologies LLC. Response/Answer due 1/24/2023. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Mark M. Supko of Attorney Mark M. Supko representing KVH Industries, Inc. (Defendant). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT signed by: Mark Supko re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark M. Supko. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-16105902 by KVH Industries, Inc. (Kelley, Marissa) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by KVH Industries, Inc. (Kelley, Marissa) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark M. Supko. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-16105902 by KVH Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 11/30/2022 (Kelley, Marissa) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by KVH Industries, Inc.. Attorney Marissa D Kelley added to party KVH Industries, Inc.(pty:dft). (Kelley, Marissa) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stormborn Technologies LLC identifying Other Affiliate Mavexar LLC for Stormborn Technologies LLC (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT: Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mab) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to KVH Industries, Inc. (mab) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KVH Industries, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16057985, filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USRE44199E, #2 Exhibit B-Schilling Declaration w Exhibits, #3 Exhibit C-Claim Chart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Related Cases, #6 Summon(s))(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less