This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/25/2022 at 07:30:47 (UTC).

Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Digi International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 Stormborn Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Digi International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony E. Porcelli and William F. Jung. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-02213

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

Presiding Judge

William F. Jung

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stormborn Technologies LLC

Defendant

Digi International, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Gregory P. Holder

Tampa, FL 33607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand & Sebolt

4940 Munson Street Nw, Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Gregory P. Holder

Attorney at Zinober Diana & Monteverde, P.A.

1511 North Westshore Blvd., Suite 700

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#11

(#11) RETURN of service executed on 10/05/2022 by Stormborn Technologies LLC as to Digi International, Inc.(Wernow, Howard) Modified on 10/7/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Stormborn Technologies LLC identifying Other Affiliate Van Nguyen, Other Affiliate Mavexar LLC for Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

9 #1

Exhibit A-Related Cases

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) ORDER appointing Gregory P. Holder as mediator in this action. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/4/2022. (CCB) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

7 #1

Copy of Complaint

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Digi International, Inc. (LNR) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C-Claim Chart

1 #2

Exhibit B-Schilling Declaration w Exhibits

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Digi International Inc.'s answer or response due 12/27/2022. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/18/2022. (CCB) Modified on 11/18/2022 (CCB). (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Digi International, Inc.'s answer or response due 11/25/2022. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/17/2022. (CCB) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN of service executed on 10/05/2022 by Stormborn Technologies LLC as to Digi International, Inc.(Wernow, Howard) Modified on 10/7/2022 (CTR). (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Stormborn Technologies LLC identifying Other Affiliate Van Nguyen, Other Affiliate Mavexar LLC for Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Stormborn Technologies LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Related Cases)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER appointing Gregory P. Holder as mediator in this action. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/4/2022. (CCB) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (LNR) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Digi International, Inc. (LNR) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:22-cv-2213-WFJ-AEP. (SJB) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Digi International, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20033686) filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-USRE44199E, #2 Exhibit B-Schilling Declaration w Exhibits, #3 Exhibit C-Claim Chart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less