This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 07:33:06 (UTC).

Stopek v. AIG Assurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Stopek filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AIG Assurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth A. Marra and William Matthewman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-81704

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth A. Marra

Referral Judge

William Matthewman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Stopek

Defendants

AIG Property Casualty Company

AIG Assurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew David Gottlieb

Attorney at Milber Makris Plousadis and Seiden, LLP

1900 Nw Corporate Blvd., East Tower, Suite 440

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Max Michael Messinger

Attorney at Kanner & Pintaluga, P.A.

925 South Federal Highway, 6Th Floor

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendant Attorneys

Crystalin C Medeiros

Attorney at The Teebagy & Medeiros Law Group

2001 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd., Suite 502C

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Steven Charles Teebagy

Attorney at The Teebagy & Medeiros Law Group

2001 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd., Suite 502C

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12248481, filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Medeiros, Crystalin) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to AIG Property Casualty Company. (pcs) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#9

(#9) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER denying as moot re [1-3] Motion to Dismiss Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by AIG Assurance Company. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (ir) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A

7 #1

Summon(s)

#7

(#7) Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Demand for Jury Trial against AIG Property Casualty Company, filed by Richard Stopek. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(Messinger, Max) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#8

(#8) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 1/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by AIG Assurance Company OF FILING OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, D.E. 1 (Medeiros, Crystalin) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Mark A Greenberg as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 3/172020 at 10:00am. (Greenberg, Mark) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Calendar Call set for 12/4/2020 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 01/27/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Mark A Greenberg as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 3/172020 at 10:00am. (Greenberg, Mark) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to AIG Property Casualty Company. (pcs) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 1/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra., Calendar Call set for 12/4/2020 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Kenneth A. Marra. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract and Demand for Jury Trial against AIG Property Casualty Company, filed by Richard Stopek. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(Messinger, Max) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#6) FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment,. US Mail returned for: Matthew David Gottlieb. Updated address found and document resent to new address.Kanner & Pintaluga925 S Federal HwyBoca Raton, FL 33432-6122 (mp) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER denying as moot re [1-3] Motion to Dismiss Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by AIG Assurance Company. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by AIG Assurance Company OF FILING OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, D.E. 1 (Medeiros, Crystalin) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (ir) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra and Magistrate Judge William Matthewman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12248481, filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Medeiros, Crystalin) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.