This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 08:42:57 (UTC).

Stonewater Roofing Ltd Co v. First Mercury Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Stonewater Roofing Ltd Co filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against First Mercury Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jane J. Boyle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00190

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane J. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stonewater Roofing, Ltd. Co.

Stonewater Roofing Ltd Co

Defendants

Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc.

First Mercury Insurance Company

United States Fire Insurance Company

Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ericha Ramsey Brown

Attorney at The Michael Kim Law Firm PLLC

4236 W Lovers Lane

Dallas, TX 75209

Michael Y Kim

Attorney at The Michael Kim Law Firm, PLLC

4236 W. Lovers Lane

Dallas, TX 75209

Monica Lynn Narvaez

Attorney at MKim Legal

4236 W. Lovers Lane

Dallas, TX 75209

Defendant Attorneys

Brian S Martin

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

One Riverway, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Rhonda J Thompson

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

700 North Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

Rodrigo Garcia, Jr

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons LLP

One Riverway, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

13 #1

Affidavit(s) with Exhibits

#13

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

#10

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #1

Affidavit(s)

#9

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Original Petition

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION TO ABATE: Ordered that is Lawsuit is abated until the 60th day after written notice is given pursuant to Section 541.154 of the Texas Insurance Code and Section 17.505 of the Texas Business and Commerce Code. The Court further ORDERS the parties to file a joint notice when the 60th day after written notice has passed. #12 MOTION to Dismiss is denied without prejudice to refiling after the abatement. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/25/2021) (svc) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Consent to Abatement re: 11 Order, #9 MOTION to Abate Plaintiff's Lawsuit filed by Stonewater Roofing Ltd Co (Brown, Ericha) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers Inc re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) with Exhibits) (Martin, Brian) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Martin, Brian) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff Stonewater Roofing Ltd. Co. to file a notice indicating whether it opposes the pending Motion to Abate (Doc. #9 ) on or before February 24, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/22/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers Inc, First Mercury Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company re #9 MOTION to Abate Plaintiff's Lawsuit. (Garcia, Rodrigo) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Abate Plaintiff's Lawsuit filed by Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers Inc, First Mercury Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Garcia, Rodrigo) Modified event text on 2/22/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadlines. Defendant Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc. must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before February 23, 2021. Plaintiff Stonewater Roofing Ltd. Co. must file any motion to remand on or before March 8, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/17/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Agreed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer and File Response to Notice of Removal filed by Stonewater Roofing Ltd Co (Brown, Ericha) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian S Martin for Rhonda J. Thompson on behalf of Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers Inc, First Mercury Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company. (Martin, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court construes #4 Stipulation as an agreed motion and GRANTS the motion. Defendant Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc. must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before February 16, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/11/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Agreed STIPULATION as to Answer/Responsive date by Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers Inc. (Martin, Brian) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc., First Mercury Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Crum & Forster Holdings Corp, Fairfax (US) Inc, FFHL Group Ltd, and Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited for Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc., First Mercury Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company. (Martin, Brian) Modified event text on 1/29/2021 (hml). (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by United States Fire Insurance Company, Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers, Inc., First Mercury Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11558888.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) Index of Matters Being Filed, #4 Exhibit(s) State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Original Petition, #6 Exhibit(s) Citation Request, #7 Exhibit(s) Citation Request with additional information, #8 Exhibit(s) Citation - First Mercury, #9 Exhibit(s) Citation - U.S. Fire, #10 Exhibit(s) Citation - Crum & Forster, #11 Exhibit(s) Executed Citation - Crum & Forster, #12 Exhibit(s) Executed Citation - First Mercury, #13 Exhibit(s) Executed Citation - U.S. Fire, #14 Exhibit(s) First Mercury & U.S. Fire's Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer with Jury Fee, #15 Exhibit(s) Notice of Related Case, #16 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Interested Parties) (Martin, Brian) Modified payment information on 1/29/2021 (hml). (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stonewater Roofing, LTD. CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where Crum & Forster Insurance Brokers is a litigant

Latest cases where First Mercury Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant