This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:19:11 (UTC).

Stoner et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Stoner filed an Other lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-62131

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nathan Stoner

Jacqulyn Stoner

Defendant

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chase Everett Jenkins

Attorney at Jenkins Lorenzo

18851 Ne 29Th Ave., Suite 700

Aventura, FL 33180

Jorge Damian Lorenzo

Attorney at Jenkins Lorenzo, LLC

18851 Ne 29Th Avenue, Suite 700

Aventura, FL 33180

Laura Louise Hoy

Attorney at Loan Lawyers, LLC

3201 Griffin Road, Suite 100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Bruce Brown

Attorney at Quarles & Brady

1395 Panther Lane, Suite 300

Naples, FL 34109-7874

Joseph Thomas Kohn

Attorney at Quarles , Brady LLP

1395 Panther Lane, Suite 300

Naples, FL 34109

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Comply with the Court's Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties, Election to Magistrate Jurisdiction, and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jacqulyn Stoner, Nathan Stoner. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Jenkins, Chase) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Filing CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc (Kohn, Joseph) Text Modified on 12/11/2020 (amb). (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Filing DEFENDANTS RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc (Kohn, Joseph) Text Modified on 12/11/2020 (amb). (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc identifying Corporate Parent SP Holding Enterprises Corp. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc (Kohn, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Jacqulyn Stoner, Nathan Stoner. (Jenkins, Chase) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#7

(#7) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Responses due by 11/30/2020 (Kohn, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

1 #16

Civil Cover Sheet CCS

1 #15

Summon(s) Summons

1 #14

Exhibit N

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13723742, filed by Nathan Stoner, Jacqulyn Stoner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Summon(s) Summons, #16 Civil Cover Sheet CCS)(Jenkins, Chase) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with the Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificate of Interested Parties, and Corporate Disclosure Statement. The parties shall file their Joint Scheduling Report, Certificate of Interested Parties, and Corporate Disclosure Statement by January 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/11/2020. (cbn) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Comply with the Court's Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties, Election to Magistrate Jurisdiction, and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jacqulyn Stoner, Nathan Stoner. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Jenkins, Chase) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Filing CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc (Kohn, Joseph) Text Modified on 12/11/2020 (amb). (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Filing DEFENDANTS RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc (Kohn, Joseph) Text Modified on 12/11/2020 (amb). (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc identifying Corporate Parent SP Holding Enterprises Corp. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc (Kohn, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file their response by December 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/25/2020. (cbn) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Jacqulyn Stoner, Nathan Stoner. (Jenkins, Chase) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Responses due by 11/30/2020 (Kohn, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/11/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 10/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Bruce Brown on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Attorney Benjamin Bruce Brown added to party Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc(pty:dft). (Brown, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Thomas Kohn on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Attorney Joseph Thomas Kohn added to party Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc(pty:dft). (Kohn, Joseph) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (amb) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13723742, filed by Nathan Stoner, Jacqulyn Stoner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Summon(s) Summons, #16 Civil Cover Sheet CCS)(Jenkins, Chase) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less