This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:29:51 (UTC).

Stoneman v. Experian Information Solutions Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Stoneman filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Teilborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00916

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James A Teilborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey James Stoneman

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions Incorporated

Trans Union LLC

Credit First National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Ali Chami

Attorney at Price Law Group APC

8245 N 85Th Way

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

McKenzie R Czabaj

Attorney at Consumer Justice Law Firm

8245 N 85Th Way

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Defendant Attorneys

Molly Jane Kjartanson

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren St., Ste. 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

James Paul Acosta

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC - Plano, TX

6900 Dallas Pkwy., Ste. 800

Plano, TX 75024

Brendan H Little

Attorney at Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP

50 Fountain Plz., Ste. 1700

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

22 #1

Proposed Order

22 #22

Main Document

#21

(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated.(Kjartanson, Molly) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Credit First National Association.(Little, Brendan) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#19

(#19) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge James A Teilborg. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/28/22. (MJF) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #16 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 12, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/27/22. (MJF) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#17

(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Kjartanson, Molly) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

16 #1

Exhibit A

16 #16

Main Document

5 #2

Summons

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20709312. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00916-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeffrey James Stoneman. (Czabaj, McKenzie) (BAC) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear telephonic appearance for Case Management Order by Credit First National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Little, Brendan) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated.(Kjartanson, Molly) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Credit First National Association.(Little, Brendan) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge James A Teilborg. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/28/22. (MJF) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #16 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 12, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/27/22. (MJF) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Kjartanson, Molly) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kjartanson, Molly) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE re: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Jeffrey James Stoneman re: #6 Order . (Czabaj, McKenzie) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Credit First National Association shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 8, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/23/22. (MJF) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Credit First National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Little, Brendan) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brendan H Little on behalf of Defendant Credit First National Association. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeffrey James Stoneman: Return of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 06/07/2022. (Chami, David) *Modified to correct service date on 6/9/2022 (WLP). (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeffrey James Stoneman: Return of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet upon Trans Union, LLC on 06/01/2022. (Czabaj, McKenzie) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jeffrey James Stoneman: Return of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet upon Credit First National Association on 06/01/2022. (Czabaj, McKenzie) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDARD CIVIL TRACK INITIAL ORDER - See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/1/2022. (WLP) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Credit First National Association, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20709312. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-00916-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Jeffrey James Stoneman. (Czabaj, McKenzie) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeffrey James Stoneman. (Czabaj, McKenzie) (BAC) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20709312 filed by Jeffrey James Stoneman. (Czabaj, McKenzie) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit First, National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant