This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:25:03 (UTC).

STONEHILL v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 STONEHILL filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randolph D. Moss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03644

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randolph D. Moss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAULINE DALE STONEHILL

Defendant

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Eldon Heggestad

Attorney at ROBERT E. HEGGESTAD

1747 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw, Suite 1250

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

1 #10

Exhibit 6

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6625722) filed by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #14

Exhibit 10

#4

(#4) ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Parties (Heggestad, Robert) Modified on 1/7/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #6

Exhibit 2

1 #12

Exhibit 8

1 #11

Exhibit 7

1 #13

Exhibit 9

1 #5

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/10/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #9

Exhibit 5

2 #1

Notice and Consent

1 #8

Exhibit 4

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #4 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to robert@reheggestad.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Do not select All Parties for service. You must select the party that has been served and then entered the date the party was served. (ztd, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Parties (Heggestad, Robert) Modified on 1/7/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/10/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6625722) filed by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less